Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc. v. San Juan Cable LLC

Defendant: San Juan Cable LLC
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02135
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A. Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 126 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 7, 2013. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 10, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 22 Motion to Dismiss; Noted 24 Motion submitting documents. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/10/2012. (TC)
August 22, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Remanding the case to the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/22/2012.(TC)
September 13, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 34 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, and DENYING 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/13/12. (CL)
April 10, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion to Compel. PRTC shall produce the responsive documents by 5/10/13. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 10, 2013. (McGiverin, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc. v. San Juan Cable LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Cable LLC
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: David H. Evans
Represented By: Dana Frix
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon
Represented By: Dylan M. Carson
Represented By: Patrick J. Pascarella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]