Falcon v. Puerto Rico Ports Authority et al

Defendant: Ivelisse Castro-Guzman, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Castro, Puerto Rico Ports Authority, Gilberto Casillas-Esquilin and Conjugal Partnership Esquilin-Doe
Plaintiff: Linnette Falcon-Cuevas
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01892
Filed: October 24, 2012
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: Guaynabo
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 13 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant Casillas' motion to dismiss. The motion to dismiss plaintiff Falcon's Fifth Amendment and Equal Protection claims is GRANTED as to all defe ndants. Those claims, accordingly, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion to dismiss plaintiff Falcon's First Amendment political discrimination claim and her Puerto Rico law claims against all defendants is DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/28/2013. (brc)
August 28, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 motion for summary judgment. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 8/28/2014. (MT)
August 29, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 motion for summary judgment. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 8/29/2014. (MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Falcon v. Puerto Rico Ports Authority et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivelisse Castro-Guzman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Castro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Ports Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Casillas-Esquilin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Esquilin-Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnette Falcon-Cuevas
Represented By: Celina Romany-Siaca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]