Santiago-Ortiz v. Public Broadcasting Service et al

Defendant: Israel Cruz-Santiago, Public Broadcasting Service, Puerto Rico Corporation for Public Broadcasting, ABC Insurance Companies and Michelle De-La-Cruz
Plaintiff: Lyssette Milagros Santiago-Ortiz
Case Number: 3:2012cv01964
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jose A Fuste
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Quash. The complaint as to PBS is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jose A Fuste on 5/9/2013. (mrj)
July 15, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jose A Fuste on 07/15/2013. (dv)
December 4, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 55 , 56 MOTION to dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b) (1) and (6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to Public Broadcasting Service, filed by Puerto Rico Corporation for Public Broadcasting. Their motion to dismiss Santiago-Ortiz's Sections 1981 and 1983 claims is GRANTED. Their motion to dismiss Santiago-Ortiz's Title VII claims is DENIED. Because we retain jurisdiction over Santiago-Ortiz's Title VII claims, jurisdiction over her supplemental Puerto Rico law claims remains proper under 28 U.S.C. § 1367. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 12/4/2013.(mrj)
February 4, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 86 Motion to Dismiss filed by Puerto Rico Corporation for Public Broadcasting. Because we retain jurisdiction over Santiago-Ortiz's Title VII claims, jurisdiction over her supplemental Puerto Rico law claims remains proper under 28 U.S.C. § 1367. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 02/04/2014.(mrj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago-Ortiz v. Public Broadcasting Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Cruz-Santiago
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Broadcasting Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Corporation for Public Broadcasting
Represented By: Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle De-La-Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyssette Milagros Santiago-Ortiz
Represented By: Nydia Gonzalez-Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]