Ramirez-Ortiz et al v. Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe et al

Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies, Does I-X, Anibal Lugo-Rosas, Moe-Roe Conjugal Partnershipd I-X, Jorge Valero Torres Olmeda, Luis R. Vega-Torres, Karen Rodriguez, Damian Grovas-Abad, Edwin Perez-Marrero, Ivan F. Gonzalez-Cancel, SIMED, Hospital Bella Vista, Dorado Health Inc. and Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe
Plaintiff: Jose Irizarry-Ortiz, Javier Irizarry-Ortiz, Miguel A. Ramirez-Ortiz and Eliezer Irizarry-Ortiz
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv02024
Filed: December 18, 2012
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 209 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 116 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Hospital de La Concepcion's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2014. (brc)
April 28, 2014 264 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 162 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 185 Motion Requesting Order; and 198 Motion in Limine. Defendant Hospital Bella Vista's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. Hospital Bella Vista's motion requesting extension of partial judgment is also DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion in limine to preclude expert testimony is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/28/2014. (brc)
July 23, 2014 335 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 306 motion for summary judgment; and re 332 Motion in Limine. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Hospital Bella Vista's motion for summary judgment, joined by Dr. Rodriguez and SIMED 4. All claims for Hospi tal Bella Vista's liability based on the negligence of physicians other than Dr. Rodriguez are DISMISSED. Hospital Bella Vista's motion in limine at Docket No. 332 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/23/2014. (brc)
August 13, 2014 351 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 282 Motion for Summary Judgment, and re 342 Motion in Limine. The Court GRANTS Dr. Lugo's motion in limine (Docket No. 342), and DENIES Dr. Lugo's motion for summary judgment, (Docket No. 282). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/13/2014. (brc)
August 13, 2014 352 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 273 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and re 309 Motion for Summary Judgment. Both plaintiffs' and defendant CCCPRC's motions for summary judgment (Docket Nos. 273 and 309), are DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/13/2014. (brc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramirez-Ortiz et al v. Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anibal Lugo-Rosas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe-Roe Conjugal Partnershipd I-X
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Valero Torres Olmeda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis R. Vega-Torres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeanette Rodriguez-De Leon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Grovas-Abad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Perez-Marrero
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Represented By: Eugene F. Hestres-Velez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan F. Gonzalez-Cancel
Represented By: Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Bella Vista
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Health Inc.
Represented By: Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe
Represented By: Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Irizarry-Ortiz
Represented By: Leticia Casalduc-Rabell
Represented By: Seth Erbe
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Irizarry-Ortiz
Represented By: Leticia Casalduc-Rabell
Represented By: Seth Erbe
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Seth Erbe
Represented By: Leticia Casalduc-Rabell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Irizarry-Ortiz
Represented By: Leticia Casalduc-Rabell
Represented By: Seth Erbe
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]