Taboas v. Fiddler Gonzalez Rodriguez, PSC

Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Taboas
Defendant: Fiddler Gonzalez Rodriguez, PSC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01205
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 51 motion for summary judgment; re 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; re 60 Motion to Strike; and 76 Motion to Strike. The Court DENIES defendant FGR's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 51), plaintiff Tab oas' motion for partial summary judgment (Docket No. 54), and plaintiff Taboas' second motion to strike (Docket No. 76.) The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART plaintiff Taboas' first motion to strike (Docket No. 60.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/20/2014. (brc)
August 28, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 100 Motion in Limine and re 114 Emergency Motion to Exclude Defendant's New Evidence; re 101 Motion in Limine to Exclude Anecdotal Evidence Concerning Other Employees, re 102 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Emma Can cio and re 104 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of FGR's Insurance Policy with Chartis Insurance Company (Now AIG Insurance Company); re 103 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Taboa's Cancer Diagnosis and Treatment and re 105 Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence or Reference to the Specific Monetary Amount of Damages Sought by Plaintiff. The Court DENIES Taboas's two motions in limine (Docket Nos. 100 & 114-1), and three of FGR's motions in limine (Docket Nos. 101; 102; 104). The Court GRANTS two of FGR's motions in limine (Docket Nos. 103 & 105.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/28/2014. (brc)
August 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 19 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Having considered Ms. Taboas' motion (Docket No. 19), and defendant's memorandum of law in support of allowing Mr. Manzano-Yates to take plaintiff's deposition, (Docket No. 20), the Court DENIES plaintiff Taboas' motion. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/09/2013. (brc)
January 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and re 31 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff Taboas' motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. The Court GRANTS defendant FGR's motion for leave to amend its answer and accepts the amended answer. The answer shall be filed as a separate document no later than January 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/03/2013. (brc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taboas v. Fiddler Gonzalez Rodriguez, PSC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Taboas
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiddler Gonzalez Rodriguez, PSC
Represented By: Pedro J. Manzano-Yates
Represented By: Enrique R. Padro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]