Sun Commodities, Inc. v. Selectos Whole Foods, Inc. et al

Defendant: Caroline Ward, Thomas Ward and Selectos Whole Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sun Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01429
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Carmen C. Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sun Commodities, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 6/20/13.(ljt)
June 21, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approved and adopted 21 Report and Recommendation on 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/21/2013. (mld)
July 15, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendation re: 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 7/12/2013.(mld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Commodities, Inc. v. Selectos Whole Foods, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Ward
Represented By: David A Carrion-Baralt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ward
Represented By: David A Carrion-Baralt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectos Whole Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos E. Rodriguez-Quesada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Orlando Fernandez
Represented By: Robert E. Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]