Bailey v. Five Star Quality Care Inc et al

Plaintiff: Robert G Bailey
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care Inc, Nancy Brooks, Derrick Davino, Kimberly Rice, Ted Turner and Daniel Crowley
Case Number: 0:2013cv00196
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Lancaster
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 38 Report and Recommendation, granting in part and denying in part Defendant Five Star's 22 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended C omplaint, granting as to Plaintiff's third cause of action and denying as to Plaintiff's fifth cause of action; granting Defendant Defino and Defendant Turner's 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying Defendan t Brook's 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Amended Complaint); denying Defendant Crolley's 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 03/06/2014. (bshr, )
August 28, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 61 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 8/28/2014.(gmil)
February 3, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to inform the court in writing of the status of this case on or before February 10, 2015, and advise if the case is ready for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 2/3/2015. (gmil)
February 11, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismisses defendants Defino and Turner with prejudice. (gmil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Five Star Quality Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Bailey
Represented By: Janet Tetu Butcher
Represented By: Jenny Anderson Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Davino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]