Klepper v. Bi-Lo

Plaintiff: Carolyn Diane Klepper
Defendant: Bi-Lo
Case Number: 0:2013cv01167
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: York
0 Judge: Joseph F Anderson
1 Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court will allow the plaintiff thirty (30) days within which to notify the court of the identity of the new attorney to represent the plaintiff in this case or, alternatively, of the plaintiffs desire to proceed wit h this litigation without an attorney. The plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, complete the attached notice, and mail it to the Clerk of Court at the address indicated. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/06/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dsto, )
March 11, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If the plaintiff fails to participate in the telephone status conference, the court will be left with no recourse except to dismiss this action with prejudice under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 03/11/2014. (dsto, )
March 18, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the action with prejudice under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 03/18/2014. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klepper v. Bi-Lo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Diane Klepper
Represented By: Janet Elizabeth Rhodes
Represented By: Benjamin M Mabry
Represented By: David Bradley Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-Lo
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]