Mouzon v. Metts et al

Plaintiff: Robbie Mauzon
Defendant: James Metts, James Clauson, Sgt Hair and Aubrey Kelly
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00818
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
 
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr (Other)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel; denying 44 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/8/2013.(abuc)
October 18, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER adopting 19 Report and Recommendation. It is ordered that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant James Metts are dismissed without prejudice and without issuance of service of process. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/18/2013.(abuc)
April 25, 2014 82 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 78 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 63 Motion to Compel filed by Robbie Mouzon, 54 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Robbie Mouzon, 68 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Aubrey Kelly, Sgt Hair, James Clauson, 57 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Robbie Mouzon, 62 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Robbie Mouzon. It is ordered that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 68) is granted on the issue of Pl aintiff's failure to exhaust and that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion to be Accommodated with Access to the Law (ECF No. 54), Motion for Medical Examination (ECF No. 57), Motion for Judgment by Default (ECF No 62), and Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Comply with his Discovery Requests (ECF No. 63) are deemed moot. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 4/25/2014. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mouzon v. Metts et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Mauzon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Metts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clauson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Hair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]