Epps v. McCall

Respondent: Michael McCall
Petitioner: Dale Epps
Case Number: 1:2013cv00873
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2013. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/8/2013. (abuc)
June 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Report and Recommendation. The Petitioner's section 2254 petition is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process upon Respondent Michael McCall. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/13/2013.(abuc)
June 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that this case is dismissed without prejudice. (abuc)
July 10, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2013. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps v. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.