Carolina Pride Inc v. McMaster et al

Plaintiff: Carolina Pride Inc
Defendant: Henry McMaster, David M Pascoe, Jr and H B Limehouse, Jr
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv04016
Filed: December 12, 2008
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2009 47 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The court orders that Plaintiff post a bond of one hundred dollars ($100.00) prior to February 22, 2009. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/30/2009.(cbru, )
February 17, 2009 52 Featured Case AMENDED OPINION & ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carolina Pride Inc; granting in part 51 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Henry McMaster, H B Limehouse, Jr. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/17/2009. (cbru, )
August 13, 2009 70 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/13/2009.(ssam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carolina Pride Inc v. McMaster et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Pride Inc
Represented By: J Christopher Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMaster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Pascoe, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H B Limehouse, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]