Doyle v. South Carolina Democratic Party, The et al

Plaintiff: Brian Ryan B Doyle
Defendant: South Carolina Democratic Party, The, Carol Fowler, Jay Parmley and John Doe
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00203
Filed: January 27, 2010
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Referring Judge: William M Catoe
Presiding Judge: Henry F Floyd
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting in part denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss; to the extent that Plaintiff means to assert a Section 1983 claim based on the alleged conduct of State Representa tive Clyburn and unnamed others as it relates to Plaintiff's employment, Plaintiff shall be permitted to go forward on that claim. All of Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed. denying 117 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint re 123 R eport and Recommendations, Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald added. This matter is recommitted to the Magistrate for further proceedings on Plaintiff's sole remaining claim.. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/31/2011. Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(asni, )
August 28, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 205 Report and Recommendation, granting 192 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Bill Clyburn Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 8/28/2012. (asni, )
April 23, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and adopting the Report and Recommendation 53 of the Magistrate Judge. Further, Plaintiff's objections to the Magistrate Judge's orders are overruled and the Magistrate Judge's decisions are affirmed. Signed by Honorable Henry F Floyd on April 23, 2010.(csam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doyle v. South Carolina Democratic Party, The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ryan B Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Democratic Party, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Parmley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]