Skelton v. Navy Personnel Command

Plaintiff: James B Skelton
Defendant: Navy Personnel Command
Case Number: 3:2010cv01958
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Referring Judge: Robert S Carr
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment of Veteran's Benefits
Cause of Action: 10:1408
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS declining to adopt 8 Report and Recommendations. The case shall be recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert S Carr added.. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/18/2010. Motions referred to Robert S Carr.(asni, )
March 26, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 59 Report and Recommendations denying 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donald P Quinn and recommits the matter to the Magistrate Judge for additional pre-trial handling. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 3/26/2012. (asni, )
August 28, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 79 Report and Recommendation granting 73 Motion to dismiss; denying 62 Motion for the court to direct the PEB to grant disability benefits. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 8/28/2012. (asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skelton v. Navy Personnel Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Personnel Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.