Samuel et al v. FIFA et al

Plaintiff: Loretta L Samuel and William R Samuel
Defendant: FIFA, ESPN Inc, Anheuser-Busch Co Inc, Adidas America Inc and Hyundai Motor America
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00423
Filed: February 22, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 162 Report and Recommendation, denying 138 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing Federation Internationale de Football Association without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 9/26/2012. (jpet, )
May 16, 2013 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 197 Report and Recommendation, granting 166 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot 164 MOTION that the case continue with trial or settlement, denying as moot [1 81] Motion for Hearing, denying as moot 186 Motion for Hearing, denying as moot 187 Motion for Settlement, denying as moot 191 Motion for Hearing, denying as moot 201 Motion for Damages. Signed by the Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/16/2013. (bshr, )
October 26, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to notify the court within fourteen days from the date of this order of the identity of replacement counsel or of the plaintiff's desire to proceed with this litigation without an attorney( Status Report due by 11/9/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 10/26/2011. (jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Samuel et al v. FIFA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta L Samuel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Samuel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIFA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESPN Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Co Inc
Represented By: Sterling G Davies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America Inc
Represented By: Ashley B Summer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]