Mitchell v. Liberty Tax Services et al

Defendant: Liberty Tax Services and Marilyn Kirkland
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Mitchell
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00609
Filed: March 14, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: The Clerk shall serve a copy of the Order for Rule to Show Cause, together with another copy of the Report, on Plaintiff at his current address. (Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2011, Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2011) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/4/2011. (cbru, )
November 2, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 24 Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/2/2011. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285 forms)(ssam, )
March 6, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 55 Report and Recommendations, Defendant Marilyn Kirkland is dismissed from this matter without prejudice. Marilyn Kirkland terminated. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/6/2012. (jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mitchell v. Liberty Tax Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Tax Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Kirkland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]