Hays et al v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Vivian R Hays, Kenneth Wood, Angela M Arthur and Leapin Eagle, LLC
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company and Lawyers Title Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00619
Filed: March 14, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/8/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/15/2011.]
March 14, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER 2054 TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC -South Carolina. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 1 Transmittal) (hdj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/15/2011.]
February 27, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court SUGGESTION OF REMAND recommending that cases 3:11-cv-572-JFA (Farahzad v. Lawyers Title Insurance Company et al) and 3:11-cv-619-JFA (Hays et al v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company et al) be remanded to the transferee districts. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/27/2012. (bshr, )
March 12, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all contents in the record of case 3:11-cv-619-JFA be remanded to the transferor court (The District of Northern California). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 03/12/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-00619-JFA, 8:09-mn-02054-JFA(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hays et al v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian R Hays
Represented By: Justin Potter Karczag
Represented By: Thomas G Foley, Jr
Represented By: Michael P Denver
Represented By: Robert L Brace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wood
Represented By: Michael P Denver
Represented By: Robert L Brace
Represented By: Thomas G Foley, Jr
Represented By: Justin Potter Karczag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Arthur
Represented By: Robert L Brace
Represented By: Michael P Denver
Represented By: Thomas G Foley, Jr
Represented By: Justin Potter Karczag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leapin Eagle, LLC
Represented By: Robert L Brace
Represented By: Michael P Denver
Represented By: Thomas G Foley, Jr
Represented By: Justin Potter Karczag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent OE Clinkscale
Represented By: Margaret A. Keane
Represented By: Sebastian L. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent OE Clinkscale
Represented By: Margaret A. Keane
Represented By: Sebastian L. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]