Cross v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas

Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Intervenor: John David Cross
Plaintiff: Janice Marie Cross
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv01010
Filed: April 28, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address., Motions terminated: denying 3 MOTION to Intervene filed by John David Cross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 6/17/2011. (jpet, )
July 19, 2011 21 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 14 Report and Recommendations, granting 18 Motion to Consolidate Cases, denying 18 Motion to Intervene, finding as moot 18 Motion to Preserve the Record Under Rule 42(a) FRCP filed by Janice Marie Cross. The consolidated action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/19/2011.(ssam, )
April 28, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiff's emergency petition for injunctive relief and temporary restraining order, re 1 Complaint, filed by Janice Marie Cross and re-referring further pretrial proceedings to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/28/2011. (jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cross v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: John David Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Marie Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]