Babcock Center Inc v. United States of America, The

Defendant: United States of America, The
Plaintiff: Babcock Center Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv01721
Filed: July 18, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying (99) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:11-cv-01721-CMC; denying (84) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:11-cv-03155-CMC. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/20/2013.Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-01721-CMC, 3:11-cv-03155-CMC(ssam, )
May 2, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (43) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (43) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 3:11-cv-01721-CMC; granting in part and denying in part (31) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (31) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 3:11-cv-03155-CMC. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/2/2013.Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-01721-CMC, 3:11-cv-03155-CMC(cbru, )
June 4, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The court dismisses Babcock Center's claim for refund of penalties paid for the fourth quarter of 2007 (tax period ending December 31, 2007) for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/4/2013. Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-01721-CMC, 3:11-cv-03155-CMC(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Babcock Center Inc v. United States of America, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babcock Center Inc
Represented By: Edward David Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]