Smith et al v. State of South Carolina State Election Commission, The et al

Plaintiff: Ann Smith, Tommie Reece, John Pettigrew, Bob Shirley and Robert Tinsley
Defendant: State of South Carolina State Election Commission, The and South Carolina, State of
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01543
Filed: June 11, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Anderson
0 Judge: J Michelle Childs
1 Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
2 Judge: Clyde H Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 10 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ann Smith, Robert Tinsley, John Pettigrew, Tommie Reece, Bob Shirley. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie, Honorable Clyde H Hamilton, Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/18/2012. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 6/18/2012 (cbru, ).
September 24, 2012 20 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER re 18 Amended Complaint. (Service of Amended Complaint and Motion due by 5:00 p.m. on 9/25/2012, Response to Motion by Defendants due by 9/28/2012). Signed for the court by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/24/2012. (ssam, )
October 3, 2012 42 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 24 Motion for TRO and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Clyde H Hamilton, Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie, Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/3/2012.(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith et al v. State of South Carolina State Election Commission, The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Smith
Represented By: Candy Kern-Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Reece
Represented By: Candy Kern-Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pettigrew
Represented By: Candy Kern-Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Shirley
Represented By: Candy Kern-Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tinsley
Represented By: Candy Kern-Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Carolina State Election Commission, The
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]