G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Camden Wing Shack LLC et al

Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Defendant: Camden Wing Shack LLC and Crystal Lee Bryson
Case Number: 3:2012cv02933
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 Report and Recommendation, granting 23 Motion for Default Judgment; directing default judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Camden Wing Shack LLC in the amount of $8,428.75 ($6,000 damages, plus $2,428.75 in costs and fees). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/01/2013.(bshr, )
August 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Bryson has failed to respond to the Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Entry #30]. As such, it appears to the court that she does not oppose the motion. Based on the foregoing, Bryson is directed to advise the court by August 21, 2013, whether she opposes Plaintiff's motion and to identify the legal grounds for such opposition. If Bryson fails to file an adequate response, a determination will be made on the existing record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/8/2013. (abuc)
August 26, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re email correspondence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/26/2013. (jpet, )
December 6, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 40 Report and Recommendation, granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment against Crystal Lee Bryson a/k/a Crystal L. Bryson a/k/a Crystal Lee Trimnal. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 12/06/2013. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Camden Wing Shack LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Represented By: Leonard R Jordan, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Wing Shack LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Lee Bryson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]