Companion Life Insurance Company v. Durbin et al

Defendant: Amy C Durbin, Dustin L Durbin, Shelby Lynn Durbin and Amber B Kirby
Plaintiff: Companion Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00917
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Defendants the court will conduct a telephone conference 07/31/2013 at 11:30 AM and directing Defendants to complete the attached form and return it to the court as soon as possible. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/12/2013. (bshr, )
July 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Defendants the court has rescheduled the telephone conference set for July to Thursday, August 29, 2013 at 10 a.m. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/23/2013. (bshr, )
September 11, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS directing the Clerk of Court to disburse the funds being held in this case as follows: (1) $350.00 to reimburse Amy C. Durbin for her advancement on the funeral bill; (2) $6,361.75 to Piatt and Barnhill Funeral Directors, Inc., 420 Locust Avenue, Washington, Pennsylvania 15301; and (3) The balance divided evenly among Amy C. Durbin, Dustin L. Durbin and Shelby Lynn Durbin. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Statement of Funeral Expenses for James L. Durbin)(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Companion Life Insurance Company v. Durbin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy C Durbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin L Durbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Lynn Durbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber B Kirby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr
Represented By: B Allen Bullard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]