Spencer v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scott Spencer
Case Number: 3:2013cv01306
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, relieving Kathleen M. McDaniel, Esq. as counsel of record for plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/30/2013. (bshr, )
July 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to notify the court of the identity of his new attorney or, alternatively, of the his desire to proceed with this litigation without an attorney, and to complete the attached notice and mail it to the Clerk of Court at the address indicated within thirty (30) days. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/30/2013. (bshr, )
January 8, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying plaintiff the court will assume that he intends to goforward in this case as a pro se plaintiff and is that he must comply with all the provisions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Federal Rules of Evidence, and the Local Rules of this District for the duration of this case. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 01/08/0214. (bshr, )
February 26, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel /and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute, ordering the Plaintiff to respond to any discovery requests submitted to Plaintiff by Defendant within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order and denying as to dismissal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 02/26/2014.(bshr, )
April 9, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution, dismissing the action pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/09/2014.(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: John T Lay
Represented By: Alfred Johnston Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Spencer
Represented By: Kathleen McColl McDaniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]