H & C Corporation Inc v. Puka Creations LLC et al

Defendant: Puka Creations LLC and Robert Puka
Plaintiff: H & C Corporation Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00013
Filed: January 3, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 13 Motion for Leave to File an Answer; denying 18 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 11/15/2012.(hcic, )
May 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees.The Court awards attorney's fees to the plaintiff in the amount of $6,519.00 plus costs in the amount of $30.58 for a total award of $6,549.58. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 5/24/2013.(gnan )
October 11, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/11/2013. (hcic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H & C Corporation Inc v. Puka Creations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puka Creations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Puka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H & C Corporation Inc
Represented By: William Y Klett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.