Monterey Bay Homes LLC v. Chambers et al

Defendant: Rene Chambers, Palmetto Design Group LLC, Wall Tec LLC and Robert Chambers
Plaintiff: Monterey Bay Homes LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00891
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Exclude; denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 67 Motion to Exclude. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 3/31/2014. (hcic, )
April 29, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice as to the claims between Plaintiff and Defendants Robert Chambers, Rene Chambers, and Wall Tec, LLC, upon good cause shown within thirty (30) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 4/29/2014. (hcic, )
May 6, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. It is ordered that Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Palmetto Design Group is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by The Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 5/6/2014. (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey Bay Homes LLC v. Chambers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Design Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wall Tec LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Bay Homes LLC
Represented By: W Andrew Gowder, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]