McFadden v. Jepertinger

Plaintiff: Joseph Lee McFadden
Defendant: John C Jepertinger
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00622
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/11/2013. (mcot, )
May 13, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS ORDERED that the within matter is herewith referred back to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D. West for further consideration consistent with this order. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 5/13/2013. (mcot, )
May 28, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court adopts the Report 14 and incorporates it herein. It is therefore ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 5/28/2013. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McFadden v. Jepertinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee McFadden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Jepertinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]