Starr v. Jordan et al

Plaintiff: Levern Starr
Defendant: Wallace H Jordan, Jr and Patricia Singleton Parr
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01033
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court hereby overrules Plaintiff's objections and adopts the Magistrate Judge's R&R 17 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED all claims against Defendant Jordan are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 6/25/2013. (mcot, )
November 5, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 48 by November 21, 2013. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/5/2013. (mcot, )
January 14, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation 57 of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and incorporated by reference. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to prosecute and comply with court orders pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 48 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/14/2014. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Starr v. Jordan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levern Starr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace H Jordan, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Singleton Parr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]