Robinson v. Amonitti et al

Defendant: L Fripp, George Amonitti, E Holcomb and B Awood
Plaintiff: Corey Jawan Robinson
Case Number: 5:2013cv00504
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Dorchester
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/22/2013.(mcot, )
October 1, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to provide the requested service documents and has therefore failed to comply with an order of this court. Accordingly, the case against these thirteen defendants: Sgt. Jaines Jones; Ofc. Jerome Mid dleton; Ofc. Travis Adams; Ofc. Samuel Howell; RN Brenda Fogel Fields; Sgt. Simmons; Lt. Cooper; Ofc. C. Trusho; CCC T. McCants; Ofc. W. Williams; Ofc. Gillard; Ofc. P. Owens; and Sgt. Marquart, is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/1/2013. (mcot, )
October 18, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/18/2013.(mcot, )
January 9, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, by January 27, 201 4. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/9/2014. (mcot, ) Modified on 1/9/2014 to edit text (mcot, ).
March 18, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation [ECF No. 85 ]. For the reasons articulated by the Magistrate Judge, it is therefore ORDERED that the above-listed case is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/17/2014. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Amonitti et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Fripp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Amonitti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Holcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Awood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jawan Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]