McDowell v Drew

Petitioner: William McDowell
Respondent: Darlene Drew
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00709
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Marlboro
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court hereby adopts the R&R (Entry 18 ), and it is ORDERED that the Petitioner's motion for default judgment (Entry 11 ) is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Sol Blatt, Jr on 7/18/2013. (mcot, )
September 4, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment 26 by September 23, 2013. Petitioner is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action against Respondent will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/4/2013. (mcot, )
February 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Court adopts and incorporates the Magistrate Judge's R&R (Entry 44 ). The Court grants the Respondent's motion for summary judgment (Entry 26 ) and overrules the Petitioner's objections (Entry 47 ). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Sol Blatt, Jr on 2/27/2014. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDowell v Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William McDowell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darlene Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]