Berry v. SCDC Official et al

Plaintiff: Brian K Berry
Defendant: Dr Tomarchio
Case Number: 5:2013cv00736
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Clarendon
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 26 Motion for TRO; affirming 33 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/31/2013.(eric, )
August 27, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Produce; denying 36 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 40 Motion to Hold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/27/2013.(mcot, )
June 10, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming 87 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/10/2014.(eric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. SCDC Official et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Tomarchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.