USA v. Bank Account in the amount of $20,537.42

 
Case Number: 4:2006cv04016
Filed: January 20, 2006
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Forfeiture of Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2008 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and reserving ruling in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/31/2008. (KC)
January 5, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 183 Motion to Dismiss; denying 183 Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/5/2009. (KC)
January 5, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/5/2009. (KC)
January 27, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion for reconsideration re 208 Letter, 209 Response filed by Timothy Jewell. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/27/2009. (KC)
March 24, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting government's motion for summary judgment (Docket 171) with respect to Dataport and Turbo ISP bank accounts; denying as moot Jewell's motion for immediate dismissal or court-ordered jury trial (Docket 183) in relation to the Dataport and Turbo ISP accounts. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/24/2009. (KC)
February 1, 2006 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Publish Notice of Civil Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/1/06. (SKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Bank Account in the amount of $20,537.42
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]