First National Bank in Sioux Falls v. First National Bank South Dakota et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv04101
Filed: June 9, 2006
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court Court Trial MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/10/09. (SLW)
September 11, 2009 188 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/11/09. (JMM)
September 9, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff is ordered to draft proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/9/10. (SLW)
October 27, 2010 226 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Costs Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/26/10. (CMS)
March 4, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 229 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion for relief from Judgment, and alteration or amendment of Judgment. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/3/11. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Bank in Sioux Falls v. First National Bank South Dakota et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]