Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Schieffer

Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Defendant: Kevin V. Schieffer
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv04037
Filed: April 9, 2010
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 6/16/10. (CMS)
July 13, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 29 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 07/13/2010. (LH)
March 8, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting re 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/8/12. (CMS)
June 28, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses. Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 6/28/13. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Schieffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Represented By: R. Alan Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin V. Schieffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]