Harp v. Mike Durfee State Prison

Plaintiff: George Harp
Defendant: Mike Durfee State Prison
Case Number: 4:2011cv04149
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Bon Homme
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying as moot 6 Motion for release of petition; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing clerk to effect service and requiring defendants to answer. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/20/2012. (KC)
June 19, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to amend complaint; denying 30 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/19/2012. (KC)
January 31, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/31/13. (KC)
May 6, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 57 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot [] Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/6/2013. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harp v. Mike Durfee State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Durfee State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.