United States of America v. Kuyper et al

Thirdparty_plaintiff: Raymond Ehrman, Mary L. Kuyper and Duane L. Kuyper
Defendant: Kuyper Family Living Trust, Vision Unlimited, Curtis Cavett, Duane L. Kuyper and Mary L. Kuyper
Plaintiff: United States of America
Thirdparty_defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Office of Inspector General, Congress of the United States of America, James M. Daugherty, Brendan V. Johnson, Daniel A. Applegate, United States District Court and Department of the Treasury- Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv04170
Filed: December 1, 2011
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER denying [] Motion to Change Venue; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Strike re 9 Answer to Complaint and Third Party Complaint; denying 22 Objection. The Third Party Complaint is stricken and no person or entity named as a third-party defendant shall be considered a party to this action, including Raymond Ehrman. The Answer to Complaint is stricken except insofar as it denies all allegations made by the United States in it's Complaint. Signed by Hon. Richard G. Kopf on 2/29/12. (SST)
May 29, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Richard G. Kopf on 05/29/2012. (MWT)
October 3, 2012 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER striking sua sponte from the court file 35 Motion to Dismiss; striking sua sponte from the court file, with execption 41 Answer and Counterclaim (Paragraphs 1-72 and 88-94 are stricken insofar as they are alleged on behalf of Vision Unlimited or Kuyper Family Living Trust, paragraphs 73-87 are stricken in their entirety, and paragraphs 95-106 are not stricken); striking sua sponte from the court file, with exception 43 Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Paragraphs 1-72, 88-94, 107-115, and 119-123 are sticken insofar as they are alleged on behalf of Vision Unlimited or Kuyper Family Living Trust, paragraphs 73-87 and 116-118 are stricken in their entirety, paragraphs 95-106 are not stricken); granting in part and de nying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike; and denying 45 Motion to Require Reply to Counterclaim. The plaintiff may file a reply to the answer of Duane Kuy per and Mary Kuyper (Docket nos. 41 and 43 , paragraphs 1-64) within 21 days. Vision Unlimited or its trusteee shall be allowed 30 days in which to obtain counsel to file an answer to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Hon. Richard G. Kopf on 10/3/2012. (SST)
October 23, 2013 85 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 83 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Hon. Richard G. Kopf on 10/23/13. (SLW)
November 4, 2013 88 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Duane L. Kuyper individually and as Trustee of Kuyper Family Living Trust, Mary Kuyper, individually and as trustee of Kuyper Family Living Trust, Kuyper Family Living Trust, Vision Unlimited, and Raymond Ehrman, as Trustee of Vision Unlimited, as specifically set forth in the Judgment. Signed by Hon. Richard G. Kopf on 11/4/13. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Kuyper et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Raymond Ehrman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mary L. Kuyper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Duane L. Kuyper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuyper Family Living Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Unlimited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Cavett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane L. Kuyper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L. Kuyper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Congress of the United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: James M. Daugherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Brendan V. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Daniel A. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: United States District Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Department of the Treasury- Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]