Burke v. Ability Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Terry Burke
Defendant: Ability Insurance Company, Ability Resources, Inc., Ability Resources Holdings, Inc., Ability Reinsurance Holdings Limited and Ability Reinsurance Limited
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04051
Filed: March 23, 2012
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Gregory
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 105 Featured Case ORDER denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/22/2013. (KC)
March 6, 2013 115 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/6/2013. (KC)
May 31, 2013 150 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 First MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL REGARDING DEFENDANT, ABILITY RESOURCES, INC., granting in part and denying in part 68 First MOTION to Compel Regarding Defendant Ability Insurance Company Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/31/2013. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burke v. Ability Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Burke
Represented By: Michael Charles Abourezk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory James Erlandson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Resources, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Resources Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Reinsurance Holdings Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Reinsurance Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]