Wilbourn v. United States of America

Petitioner: James Michael Wilbourn
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv04186
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Referring Judge: John E. Simko
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver granting 20 MOTION for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance, and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by United States of America. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 1/25/13. (CMS)
March 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 3/8/13. (CMS)
August 28, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/28/2013. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilbourn v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Michael Wilbourn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Edward Salter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]