First Bank & Trust v. Greene Enterprise, LLC et al

Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Defendant: Resolute Forest Products, James Greene and Greene Enterprise, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv04017
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/3/13. (CMS) Modified execution date on 12/4/2013 (CMS).
July 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Green Enterprise, LLC; James Greene; and Resolute Forest Products. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/25/14. (DJP)
October 30, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 23 Motion To Supplement Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/29/2014. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank & Trust v. Greene Enterprise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Represented By: David J. Jencks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Forest Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.