Bettor Racing, Inc. v. National Indian Gaming Commission et al

Plaintiff: Bettor Racing, Inc. and J. Randy Gallo
Defendant: National Indian Gaming Commission
Case Number: 4:2013cv04051
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Intervene; clerk directed to file Tribe's answer and counterclaim; Tribe's request for judicial notice is granted in part; stay is lifted; and parties will jointly file a proposed schedule by 11/20/2013. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/6/2013. (KC)
September 19, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/19/2014. (KC)
January 7, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion Making Amended Judgment a Final Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/7/2015. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettor Racing, Inc. v. National Indian Gaming Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettor Racing, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith A. Moore
Represented By: Onna B. Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Randy Gallo
Represented By: Meredith A. Moore
Represented By: Onna B. Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indian Gaming Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.