Heil v. Belle Starr Saloon & Casino et al

Plaintiff: Misty N. Heil
Defendant: Belle Starr Saloon & Casino and Angie's Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv05074
Filed: September 15, 2009
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 130 objections and request for reconsideration filed by Sherwood Investment and Trust Company and affirming 120 Order granting motion to consolidate. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/11/13. (SB)
March 11, 2013 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/11/13. (SB)
February 25, 2014 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/25/14. (SB)
February 26, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/26/14. (SB)
March 30, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 20 Motion to Compel; taking under advisement plaintiff's 20 Motion to Extend Deadlines re 20 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 03/29/11. (Duffy, Veronica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Heil v. Belle Starr Saloon & Casino et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty N. Heil
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belle Starr Saloon & Casino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie's Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]