Meidinger v. City of Rapid City et al

Defendant: Sam Kooiker, City of Rapid City, Peter Ragnone, Steve Allender, Jerry Wright and John Leahy
Plaintiff: Randall J. Meidinger
Case Number: 5:2012cv05064
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting 90 Report and Recommendation; overruling 93 Objection to Report and Recommendation; overruling in part and moot in part 94 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/23/14. (SB)
October 31, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 6 Motion to Strike. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 10/31/12. (SLW)
April 23, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2014. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 4/23/14. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(JLS) Modified on 4/23/2014 to change to Opinion(JLS).
April 24, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 4/24/14. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meidinger v. City of Rapid City et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kooiker
Represented By: John K. Nooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rapid City
Represented By: John K. Nooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ragnone
Represented By: John K. Nooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Allender
Represented By: John K. Nooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Wright
Represented By: Gerald D. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Leahy
Represented By: John K. Nooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall J. Meidinger
Represented By: Paul R. Winter
Represented By: Angela M. Colbath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]