McGowan v. Mitchell et al

Defendant: Gunn, Thomas, Corizon Medical, O. Osborne and Clement Barnard
Plaintiff: Johnny L. McGowan, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00578
Filed: February 27, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 104 Featured Case ORDER granting 103 Motion for Service of Process for Defendant Vicky Bybee. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank Summons and USM 285 Form) for Defendant Bybee. Plaintiff will complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's Office within twenty-one (21) days of the date of receipt of this Order. Upon return of the service packet, process shall issue to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/17/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 17, 2014 105 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 54 Motion for Service of Process as to Defendant Dr. Clement Barnard. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/17/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 17, 2014 106 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 87 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/17/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 11, 2014 124 Featured Case ORDER: The final pretrial conference is hereby scheduled before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on Wednesday, July 1, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 661, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. The plaintiff is hereby ORDERE D to inform the Court by June 24, 2015, what witnesses other than himself, if any, he desires to call at the trial. Defendants are hereby instructed to prepare a proposed final pretrial order for this action to be filed with the Court by June 17, 2015. A copy of the proposed pretrial order shall be forwarded to Plaintiff no later June 24, 2015, so that Plaintiff may review the Order and determine what, if any, changes and/or additions he may wish to make. No later than June 24, 2015, Plai ntiff shall also file with the Court a list of his proposed trial exhibits. An Order to Produce plaintiff for the final pretrial conference and the jury trial, as well as subpoenas for the witnesses plaintiff has requested, will be entered at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/11/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 19, 2014 128 Featured Case ORDER: On July 17, 2014, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 106), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the finding of fact and conclusions of l aw of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that Dr. O. Osborne is DISMISSED as a defendant in this action WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/19/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
May 23, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion (Docket No. 39) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 23, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion (Docket No. 53) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 23, 2014 68 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion for Injunction or Restraining Order (Docket No. 55) should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 9, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Leave to Amend the Complaint Relative to Darrell Thomas. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/9/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 18, 2014 84 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/1/2014. Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 19, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/21/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. The Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. He shall assist the plaintiff with the preparation of subpoenas, discuss exhibits, instructions and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. The Magistrate Judge has been managing this case. If he considers it appropriate to appoint counsel to represent the plaintiff at trial, he should do so. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/19/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGowan v. Mitchell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Barnard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L. McGowan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]