Varsity Brands, Inc. et al v. Star Athletica, LLC

Plaintiff: Varsity Brands, Inc., Varsity Spirit Corporation and Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc.
Defendant: Star Athletica, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv02508
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G. Claxton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephone Status Conference and Directing Counsel to Submit Case Summary, ( Telephone Status Conference set for 5/10/2012 11:00 AM (EST) before Robert H. Cleland.) THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 4/23/12. (lgw)
April 24, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 04/28/2012. (Claxton, Charmiane)
April 24, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 110 , 114 Defendant's First Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 04/24/2012. (Claxton, Charmiane)
June 21, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 146 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, OVERRULING 138 Plaintiffs' Objections Sealed Document, GRANTING 143 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply DENYING 142 MOTION to Strike and Setting ( Telephone Status Conference set for 8/1/2012 11:00 AM [CST] in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland.). Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 6/21/2012. (lgw)
September 23, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Expert Deposition Deadlines and Dispositive Motion Deadlines 157 Stipulation filed by Varsity Spirit Corporation, Varsity Brands, Inc., Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc., ( Motions due by 12/7/2012.). Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 9/23/2012. (lgw)
November 13, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 159 Stipulation filed by Varsity Spirit Corporation, Star Athletica, LLC, Varsity Brands, Inc., Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc. Setting Expert Depositions and Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline, ( Expert Depositions due by 12/21/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2013.). Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 11/13/2012. (lgw)
January 15, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Establishing Page Limits, (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2013; Plaintiffs' Response and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/4/2013; Defendant's Reply due by 4/8/2013, and Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply due by 4/26/2013.). Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 1/15/2013. (lgw)
January 30, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 166 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct 165 Order to Extend Briefing Deadlines filed by Star Athletica, LLC, ( Defendant's Motions due by 2/28/2013; Plaintiffs' Response due by 4/2/2013; Defendant's Reply due by 5/6/2013, and Sur-Reply due by 5/24/2013). Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 1/30/2013. (lgw)
December 19, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 194 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Sealed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Replies; DENYING 195 Defendant's Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule and DENYING AS MOOT 196 Defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct;. Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 12/19/2013. (lgw)
March 1, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 169 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 172 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's State Law Claims. Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 3/1/2014. (lgw)
March 1, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Star Athletica, LLC against Varsity Brands, Inc., Varsity Spirit Corporation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 3/1/2014. (lgw)
March 18, 2014 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 204 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 3/18/2014. (lgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varsity Brands, Inc. et al v. Star Athletica, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varsity Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varsity Spirit Corporation
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Athletica, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]