Robinson v. Tipton County Board of Education

Defendant: Tipton County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Theaquiata Robinson
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02785
Filed: November 2, 2010
 
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephone Status Conference and Directing Counsel to Submit Case Summary, ( Telephone Status Conference set for 5/11/2012 10:30 AM (EST) before Robert H. Cleland.) THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 4/23/12. Associated Cases: 2:10-cv-02785-rhc-dkv, 2:10-cv-02817-rhc-dkv(lgw)
June 21, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting, ( Telephone Status Conference set for 7/2/2012 01:00 PM (EST) before Judge Robert H. Cleland.). Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 6/21/2012. Associated Cases: 2:10-cv-02785-RHC-dkv, 2:10-cv-02817-RHC-dkv(lgw)
August 6, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER DISMISSING Case With Prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge Robert H. Cleland on 8/6/2012. Associated Cases: 2:10-cv-02785-RHC-dkv, 2:10-cv-02817-RHC-dkv(lgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. Tipton County Board of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tipton County Board of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theaquiata Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]