Johnson v. Belvedere Gardens Condominium Association, Inc. et al

Defendant: JoAnn Lewallen, Dinkelspiel Rasmussen and Mink Law Firm, Belvedere Gardens Condominium Association, Inc. and Barbara (Williams) Hasting
Plaintiff: Cecil Johnson
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02118
Filed: February 10, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Referring Judge: Tu M. Pham
Presiding Judge: Samuel H. Mays
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion to Dismiss and referring request for costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/14/2013.
July 2, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 07/02/2013.
August 12, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations; denying Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 08/12/2013.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Johnson v. Belvedere Gardens Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnn Lewallen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinkelspiel Rasmussen and Mink Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belvedere Gardens Condominium Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara (Williams) Hasting
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]