Hutchings et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al

Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and Albert Ray Smith
Plaintiff: Maury S. Hutchings, Julie K. Hutchings and Kimberly A. Hutchings
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00246
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S. Payne
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; adopting 104 Report and Recommendations; denying 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/14. (mrm, )
May 13, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/13/2014. (nkl, )
June 6, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 183 Report and Recommendations recommending the 128 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2014. (ch, )
June 6, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 176 Report and Recommendations. Dft's Motion to Dismiss 113 is GRANTED with respect to punitive damages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2014. (ch, )
June 6, 2014 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 197 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2014. (ch, )
January 9, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER - denying 5 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/8/2014. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hutchings et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Polak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Ray Smith
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Polak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maury S. Hutchings
Represented By: D Scott Carlile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie K. Hutchings
Represented By: D Scott Carlile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Hutchings
Represented By: D Scott Carlile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]