Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00258
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/17/2013. (rsp2, )
October 4, 2013 37 RESPONSE to 36 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Jepson, Craig)
September 9, 2013 36 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC by Apple Inc.(Findlay, Eric)
September 9, 2013 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Claims for Willful Infringement by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 3, 2013 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement filed by Apple Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
August 30, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 2:12-cv-832 is hereby designated as the lead case. ****ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE UNTIL THE CONSOLIDATON ORDER IS VACATED.*** Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/30/13. (bas, )
August 28, 2013 32 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jepson, Craig)
August 26, 2013 31 Plaintiff Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC's ANSWER to 23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC.(Scardino, Daniel)
August 22, 2013 30 RESPONSE to Motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement filed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scardino, Daniel)
August 22, 2013 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Scardino, Daniel)
August 21, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #28 Motion to consolidate submitted by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. no certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
August 20, 2013 28 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scardino, Daniel) Modified on 8/21/2013 (sm, ).
August 14, 2013 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Gabriel Jones on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Jones, Joshua)
August 9, 2013 26 NOTICE by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC of Readiness for Status Conference (Halderman, Mark)
August 5, 2013 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
August 5, 2013 24 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
August 5, 2013 23 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC by Apple Inc.(Findlay, Eric)
August 5, 2013 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
July 31, 2013 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T Marando on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244973. (Marando, Christopher)
July 24, 2013 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David M DesRosier on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4235034. (DesRosier, David)
July 19, 2013 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark W Halderman on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Halderman, Mark)
July 18, 2013 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian E Ferguson on behalf of Apple Inc (Ferguson, Brian)
July 18, 2013 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anish R Desai on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4228164. (Desai, Anish)
July 18, 2013 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Cappella on behalf of Apple Inc (Cappella, Anne)
July 18, 2013 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple Inc (Stephens, Garland)
July 18, 2013 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Jane Schmidt on behalf of Apple Inc (Schmidt, Jill)
July 17, 2013 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Steven Jepson on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Jepson, Craig)
July 17, 2013 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henning Schmidt on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Schmidt, Henning)
June 27, 2013 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. Apple Inc waiver sent on 6/5/2013, answer due 8/5/2013. (ehs, )
May 28, 2013 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Apple Inc (Craft, Roger)
May 28, 2013 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Apple Inc (Findlay, Eric)
May 1, 2013 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Dacus, Deron)
April 4, 2013 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent United Wireless Holdings Inc. for Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC. (Scardino, Daniel)
April 4, 2013 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Tepera on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Tepera, Steven)
April 4, 2013 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Lawrence Hendricks on behalf of Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC (Hendricks, John)
April 3, 2013 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Scardino, Daniel)
April 3, 2013 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Scardino, Daniel)
April 3, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
April 3, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/3/13. (ehs, )
April 3, 2013 Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added (ehs, ) Modified on 4/3/2013 (ehs, ).
April 2, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4074656.), filed by Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scardino, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies LLC
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: John Lawrence Hendricks
Represented By: Daniel Scardino
Represented By: Steven Tepera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]