Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC v. Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC

Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Plaintiff: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00259
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/11/2014. (ch, )
December 11, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/11/2014. (ch, )
December 12, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/12/2014. (nkl, )
December 13, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment re: Issue Preclusion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/13/2014. (rsp2)
December 13, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 Remaining Objections to Samsung's Deposition Designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/13/2014. (rsp2)
December 13, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motion to Exclude Nettleton Supplement filed in Case No. 2:12-cv-832 as Dkt. No. 275. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/13/2014. (rsp2)
December 15, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion Leave to Supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/15/2014. (rsp2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC v. Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Telecommunications Technologies, LLC
Represented By: John Lawrence Hendricks
Represented By: Daniel Scardino
Represented By: Steven Tepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.