National Cheng Kung University v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: National Cheng Kung University
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00378
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 100 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Qualcomm Technologies Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated.( Status Conference set for 9/23/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/21/2014. (nkl, )
August 20, 2014 100 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard)
July 28, 2014 99 Featured Case ORDER granting 97 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Geo Semiconductor Inc. filed by National Cheng Kung University., GEO Semiconductor Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:13cv380) terminated., Attorney Brennan Michael Carmody and Hossain Arnold Shokouhi terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/28/2014. (nkl, )
July 28, 2014 98 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc. With Prejudice filed by National Cheng Kung University., Apple Inc. terminated., Attorney Ruffin B Cordell; Lara S Garner; Jennifer Parker Ainsworth and Justin M Barnes terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/28/2014. (nkl, )
July 22, 2014 97 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Geo Semiconductor Inc. by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
July 22, 2014 96 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc. With Prejudice by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
July 21, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 95, Agreed MOTION to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 21, 2014 95 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc. with Prejudice by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) Modified on 7/21/2014 (nkl, ).
July 2, 2014 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brennan Michael Carmody on behalf of GEO Semiconductor Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4728830. (Carmody, Brennan)
June 18, 2014 93 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2015 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Discovery due by 3/12/2015., Jury instructions due by 6/22/2015, Jury Selection set for 7/13/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/26/2015., Markman Hearing set for 1/23/2015 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/17/14. (mrm, )
June 18, 2014 92 Featured Case ORDER, granting 90 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (Member Case 2:13-cv-470) filed by National Cheng Kung University. Cisco Systems, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:13cv470) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/17/14. (mrm, )
June 16, 2014 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2014. (Court Reporter Becky Andrews - ECRO.) (bga, )
June 12, 2014 90 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (Member Case 2:13-cv-470) by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jagai, Deborah)
April 28, 2014 89 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Settlement by Cisco Systems, Inc., National Cheng Kung University. (Jones, Michael)
April 4, 2014 88 Featured Case ORDER granting 87 Joint MOTION Presently scheduled dates be taken off calendar and a scheduling conference be set for June 2014 filed by Apple Inc.. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2014 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/3/14. (bas, )
April 1, 2014 87 Joint MOTION Presently scheduled dates be taken off calendar and a scheduling conference be set for June 2014 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ISO Joint Mot re Schedule)(Garner, Lara)
March 6, 2014 86 NOTICE by National Cheng Kung University of Compliance Pursuant to Local P.R. 4-2 (Huff, Winston)
March 6, 2014 85 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Garner, Lara)
March 3, 2014 84 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION REGARDING PR 4-2 DISCLOSURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/28/2014. (nkl, )
February 27, 2014 83 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Joinder in Cisco's Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Local Rule 3-3 (Garner, Lara)
February 25, 2014 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension Regarding PR 4-2 Disclosures re 60 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Justin)
February 24, 2014 81 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Compliance regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
February 21, 2014 80 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Joinder in Qualcomm's Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Local Rule 3-3 (Garner, Lara)
February 19, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2014. (sm, )
February 18, 2014 78 NOTICE by GEO Semiconductor Inc. of Joinder in Qualcomm's Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Local Rule 3-3 (Pan, Susan)
February 17, 2014 77 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies Inc. of Compliance with Patent Disclosure (Zembek, Richard)
February 14, 2014 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2014 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc. P.R. 4-1 (Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2014 74 NOTICE by National Cheng Kung University of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 and Service of Claim Terms (Huff, Winston)
February 3, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/03/2014. (nkl, )
January 31, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER dismissing 69 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd. and North America Seoul Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/31/2014. (nkl, )
January 31, 2014 71 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Philips International, Inc. et al by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 30, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss. Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/2014. (ch, )
January 30, 2014 69 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd. and North America Seoul Semiconductor, Inc. (Member Case. 2:13-cv-00465) by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 29, 2014 68 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Defendants Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc. by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 28, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 65 Motion to Sever. Cause no. #2:13v452 is severed from 2:13cv378. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/14. (bas, )
January 28, 2014 66 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/14. (bas, )
January 27, 2014 65 Unopposed MOTION to Sever Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-452 From Consolidated Actions Under Lead Case 2:13-cv-378 by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 27, 2014 64 NOTICE by National Cheng Kung University of Compliance regarding Service of Initial Disclosure (Huff, Winston)
January 27, 2014 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies Inc. (Zembek, Richard)
January 27, 2014 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
January 24, 2014 61 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by National Cheng Kung University . (Huff, Winston)
January 22, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 5/28/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
January 21, 2014 60 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2014., Markman Hearing set for 5/6/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 9/1/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2014., Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Mediation deadline 6/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/21/2014. (ch, )
January 21, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/21/2014. (ch, )
January 21, 2014 58 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/21/2014. (ch, )
January 18, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 46 Motion to Sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/18/2014. (rsp3)
January 17, 2014 56 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, David Folsom, filed by National Cheng Kung University. (For Consolidated member cases 2:13-cv-00468 and 2:13-cv-00470) (Huff, Winston)
January 17, 2014 55 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by National Cheng Kung University (for consolidated cases under 2:13-cv-00378). (Huff, Winston)
January 17, 2014 54 Submission of Proposed Agreed Electronic Discovery order (for Consolidated Cases under 2:13-cv-00378) by National Cheng Kung University. (Huff, Winston)
January 17, 2014 53 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by National Cheng Kung University (for consolidated cases under 2:13-cv-00378). (Huff, Winston)
January 17, 2014 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss. Nicha America Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/17/2014. (ch, )
January 17, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Cree Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/17/2014. (ch, )
January 17, 2014 50 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nichia America Corporation by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 16, 2014 49 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CREE, INC. by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 8, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Nichia Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/8/2014. (ch, )
January 8, 2014 47 RESPONSE in Support re 46 Unopposed MOTION to Sever National Cheng Kung University v. Cree, Inc. From Consolidated Cases And To Correct The Consolidation Of Matters Under Lead Case, Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-00378 filed by Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 7, 2014 46 Unopposed MOTION to Sever National Cheng Kung University v. Cree, Inc. From Consolidated Cases And To Correct The Consolidation Of Matters Under Lead Case, Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-00378 by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 2, 2014 Consolidated Defendants added: GEO Semiconductor Inc (2:13cv380); Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (2:13cv452); Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Koninklijke Philips NV, Royal Philips, Philips International BV, Philips Holding USA Inc (2:13cv453); Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc (2:13cv464); Seoul Semiconductor Co Ltd, North America Seoul Semiconductor Inc (2:13cv465); Cree Inc (2:13cv466); Nichia Corporation, Nichia America Corporation (2:13cv467); Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Techologies Inc (2:13cv469); Cisco Systems Inc (2:13cv470). (mll, )
January 2, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE to be Cause No. 2:13cv378. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in Lead Case 2:13cv378. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The local rules' page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties' resources, the Court encourages parties to file a notice with the court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Court's docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. The parties shall meet and confer regarding any modifications to the docket control order and discovery order that may be necessary to accommodate consolidation of these cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/02/14. (mll, )
December 31, 2013 44 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Garner, Lara)
December 31, 2013 43 NOTICE by National Cheng Kung University OF PLAINTIFF COMPLIANCE (RE: DKT. NO. 30) WITH P.R. 4-1 AND SERVICE OF CLAIM TERMS TO DEFENDANTS APPLE INC. AND GEO SEMICONDUCTOR INC. (Huff, Winston)
December 24, 2013 42 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Corrected Notice of Compliance Pursuant to Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Garner, Lara)
December 23, 2013 41 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3-3 (Garner, Lara)
November 21, 2013 40 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/21/13. (bas, )
November 19, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion to extend deadlines. Deadline to serve Patent Rule 3-3 & 3-4 Rule Disclosures is extended to and including December 16, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/19/13. (ehs, )
November 11, 2013 38 Joint MOTION extension of deadline for Rule Disclosures by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline)(Garner, Lara)
October 14, 2013 37 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston O. Huff, # 2 Exhibit A to Huff Declaration)(Huff, Winston)
October 4, 2013 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Garner ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit J to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 3 Exhibit K to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit L to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 5 Exhibit M to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 6 Exhibit N to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 7 Exhibit O to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 8 Exhibit P to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 9 Exhibit Q to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer, # 10 Exhibit R to Garner Decl ISO Apple Reply to its Mot to Transfer)(Garner, Lara)
October 4, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #35 Reply submitted by Apple Inc.. Exceeds the page limit for filing a reply to a motion. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
October 3, 2013 35 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue -Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lara S. Garner, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N, # 7 Exhibit O, # 8 Exhibit P, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit R)(Garner, Lara) Modified on 10/4/2013 (sm, ).
September 27, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR; Robert Faulkner added as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/26/13. (mrm, )
September 26, 2013 33 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Service of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Initial and Additional Disclosures (Garner, Lara)
September 26, 2013 32 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by National Cheng Kung University (Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures in Consolidated Cases 2:13-cv-378 and 2:13-cv-380) (Huff, Winston)
September 26, 2013 31 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by National Cheng Kung University (For Consolidated Cases 2:13-cv-378 and 2:13-cv380). (Huff, Winston)
September 26, 2013 30 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2014., Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2014., Expert Witness List due by 6/2/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 9/12/2013., Markman Hearing set for 5/6/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 9/1/2014., Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2014., Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2014 10:30 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/13. (ehs, )
September 26, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER regarding Electronic Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/13. (ehs, )
September 26, 2013 28 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/13. (ehs, )
September 23, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 26, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
September 23, 2013 27 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 26 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR ***RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) Modified on 9/23/2013 (ehs, ).
September 23, 2013 26 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 27 *** MOTION to Change Venue by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) Modified on 9/23/2013 (ehs, ).
September 19, 2013 25 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. (Ret.) Robert Faulkner, filed by National Cheng Kung University. (For Defendant Apple Inc.) (Huff, Winston)
September 19, 2013 24 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling Order (for Consolidated Cases 2:13-cv-378 and 2:13-cv-380) by National Cheng Kung University. (Huff, Winston)
September 19, 2013 23 Submission of Proposed Agreed Electronic Discovery Order (for Consolidated Cases 2:13-cv-378 and 2:13-cv-380) by National Cheng Kung University. (Huff, Winston)
September 19, 2013 22 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order ((for Consolidated Cases 2:13-cv-378 and 2:13-cv-380) by National Cheng Kung University. (Huff, Winston)
September 5, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 9/5/13. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (jml)
September 4, 2013 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Buckley ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 2 Affidavit of Wu ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 3 Affidavit of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit A to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 5 Exhibit B to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 6 Exhibit C to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 7 Exhibit D to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 8 Exhibit E to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 9 Exhibit F to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 10 Exhibit G to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 11 Exhibit H to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 12 Exhibit I to Decl of Garner ISO Apple Mot to Transfer, # 13 Text of Proposed Order ISO Apple Mot to Transfer)(Garner, Lara)
September 3, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 19, answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
September 3, 2013 20 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 19 which was filed in error*** ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by National Cheng Kung University.(Huff, Winston) Modified on 9/3/2013 (ehs, ).
August 29, 2013 19 ****FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY-SEE CORRECTED DOCKET # 20 *** ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by National Cheng Kung University.(Huff, Winston) Modified on 9/3/2013 (ehs, ).
August 27, 2013 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Garner, Lara)
August 27, 2013 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc.. (Garner, Lara)
August 27, 2013 16 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against National Cheng Kung University by Apple Inc..(Garner, Lara)
August 27, 2013 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Apple Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 26, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/5/2013 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. (jml)
August 23, 2013 14 NOTICE by National Cheng Kung University of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Huff, Winston)
August 20, 2013 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin M Barnes on behalf of Apple Inc. (Barnes, Justin)
August 20, 2013 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Justin M Barnes on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4275603. (Barnes, Justin)
August 19, 2013 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lara S Garner on behalf of Apple Inc. (Garner, Lara)
August 19, 2013 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
August 14, 2013 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Cheng Kung University. Apple Inc. served on 8/6/2013, answer due 8/27/2013. (ehs, )
August 8, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 9/5/2013 10:15 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/13. (bas, )
July 19, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2013. (ch, )
May 28, 2013 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
May 6, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
May 6, 2013 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (ehs, )
May 6, 2013 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Huff, Winston)
May 3, 2013 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Jagai on behalf of National Cheng Kung University (Jagai, Deborah)
May 3, 2013 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Cheng Kung University (Huff, Winston)
May 3, 2013 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Cheng Kung University. (Huff, Winston)
May 3, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4124092.), filed by National Cheng Kung University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huff, Winston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Cheng Kung University v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Cheng Kung University
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]