Oasis Research, LLC v. Adrive, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Oasis Research, LLC
Defendant: Adrive, LLC, AT&T Inc., CARBONITE, INC., Drive Headquarters, Inc., EMC CORP., DECHO Corp., Iomega Corp., Godaddy.Com, Inc., IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., NetMass, Inc., Nirvanix, Inc., Officeware Corp., PRO SOFTNET CORP., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., Jungle Disk, LLC and Softlayer Technologies, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00435
Filed: August 30, 2010
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: Harrison
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 246 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/25/2011. (pad, )
July 25, 2011 245 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/25/2011. (pad, )
July 25, 2011 244 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/25/2011. (pad, )
July 25, 2011 243 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Ordered that Oasis is granted leave to amend it's willfulness allegations within 14 days. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/25/2011. (pad, )
July 25, 2011 242 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/25/2011. (pad, )
July 22, 2011 241 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of CARBONITE, INC. (Tindel, Andy)
July 21, 2011 240 NOTICE by NetMass, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Kaplan, Lee)
July 19, 2011 239 NOTICE by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. of Request to Terminate Electronic Notices (Hawes, Clay)
July 19, 2011 238 NOTICE by Nirvanix, Inc. re 234 Objection to Report and Recommendations Nirvanix's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in EMC Corp., Decho Corp., and Iomega Corp.'s Reply in Support of Their Objections to the Report and Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge (Parker, Greg)
July 19, 2011 237 NOTICE by PRO SOFTNET CORP. re 234 Objection to Report and Recommendations Pro Softnet Corp.'s Notice of Joinder and Joinder in EMC Corp., Decho Corp., and Iomega Corp.'s Reply in Support of Their Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge (Weldon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2011 236 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations Joinder in EMC Reply Brief in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge by CARBONITE, INC.. (Littman, Kevin)
July 18, 2011 235 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations Iron Mountain's Joinder in EMC Corp.'s Reply In Support of its Objections to the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Vakil, Bijal)
July 18, 2011 234 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations Defendant EMC Corp.'s Reply In Support of its Objections to the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Chatterjee, Indra)
July 18, 2011 233 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations - Defendant Go Daddy's Reply in Support of Its Objections t Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
July 11, 2011 232 Featured Case ORDER granting 231 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle Ann Flores terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/11/11. (cm, )
July 8, 2011 231 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CARBONITE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Michelle)
July 7, 2011 230 RESPONSE to 221 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 217 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 214 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 222 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 220 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 216 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - In re Kyocera Communications, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B - Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, In re Google, Inc., # 3 Exhibit C - Fractus, S.A. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.)(Packin, Tamir)
July 7, 2011 229 RESPONSE to 215 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendant Go Daddy's Response to Oasis Research, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 4-5))(Packin, Tamir)
July 6, 2011 228 Featured Case ORDER granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Clay Erik Hawes and Shannon A Lang terminated. C. Erik Hawes and Shannon A. Lang may withdraw from their representation of Iron Mountain, Inc. and Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/5/11. (cm, )
July 1, 2011 227 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D Etienne-Cummings on behalf of IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita)
June 30, 2011 226 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/1/2011) (cm, ).
June 30, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney submitted by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. Motion is not Signed by Attorney and lacks a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (cm, )
June 29, 2011 225 NOTICE by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Storm, Paul)
June 29, 2011 224 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay) Modified on 7/11/2011 (cm, ).
June 28, 2011 223 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
June 21, 2011 222 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations Iron Mountain's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in EMC Corp., Decho Corp., and Iomega Corp.s Objections to the Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Iron Mountain's Notice of Joinder)(Vakil, Bijal)
June 20, 2011 221 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Parker, Greg)
June 20, 2011 220 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations of United Magistrate Judge and Brief in Support Thereof by CARBONITE, INC.. (Littman, Kevin)
June 20, 2011 219 NOTICE of Joinder by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. re 217 Objection to Report and Recommendations - Iron Mountain's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in EMC Corp., Decho Corp., and Iomega Corp.s Objections to the Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Iron Mountain's Notice of Joinder)(Vakil, Bijal) Modified on 6/21/2011 (cm, ).
June 20, 2011 218 NOTICE of Joinder by PRO SOFTNET CORP. re 217 Objection to Report and Recommendations Pro Softnet Corporations Notice of Joinder and Joinder in EMC Corp., Decho Corp., and Iomega Corp.s Objections to the Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge (Weldon, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/21/2011 (cm, ).
June 20, 2011 217 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chatterjee, Indra)
June 20, 2011 216 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
June 20, 2011 215 OBJECTION to 203 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
June 20, 2011 214 OBJECTION to 204 Report and Recommendations of US Magistrate Judge on Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Weldon, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2011 213 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bijal V Vakil on behalf of IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. (Vakil, Bijal)
June 7, 2011 212 Featured Case ORDER re 209 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Oasis Research, LLC. Rackspace US, Inc., Jungle Disk, LLC and Rackspace Hosting, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/7/11. (cm, )
June 6, 2011 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadlines for Nirvanix to file objections to Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mazzant denying Nirvanixs Improper Venue Motion (Dkt. No. 200) and Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mazzant denying Defendants various motions to sever/transfer (Dkt. No. 204) is extended to June 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/6/11. (cm, )
June 5, 2011 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections to the Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Mazzant by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Greg)
June 3, 2011 209 STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF ADRIVE LLC by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Packin, Tamir) Modified on 6/6/2011 (cm, ).
June 3, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER granting 207 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Defendants to file objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation denying their various motions to sever/transfer (Dkt. no. 204) is extended to June 20, 2011. The deadline for Godaddy.Com, Inc., to file objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation denying its motion to transfer/dismiss (Dkt. no. 203) is extended to June 20, 2011. The deadline for Carbonite, Inc., to file objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation denying its motion to dismiss (Dkt. no. 202) is extended to June 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/3/11. (cm, )
June 2, 2011 207 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Magistrate Judge's Reports & Recommendations by CARBONITE, INC., DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Godaddy.Com, Inc., IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iomega Corp., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay)
June 2, 2011 206 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF RACKSPACE HOSTING, INC., RACKSPACE US, INC. AND JUNGLE DISK LLC by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Packin, Tamir)
June 1, 2011 205 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING/DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting 199 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/1/11. (cm, )
May 23, 2011 204 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by PRO SOFTNET CORP., 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Nirvanix, Inc., 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah filed by Iomega Corp., DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts filed by CARBONITE, INC., 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts filed by Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., 138 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc., 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/11. (cm, )
May 23, 2011 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serveand file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/11. (cm, )
May 23, 2011 202 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim filed by CARBONITE, INC.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/11. (cm, )
May 23, 2011 201 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 93 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Iomega Corp., DECHO Corp., EMC CORP.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C.§ 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/11. (cm, )
May 23, 2011 200 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Nirvanix, Inc.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C.§ 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/11. (cm, )
May 11, 2011 199 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 190 Scheduling Order, Docket Control Order by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order First Amended Scheduling/Docket Control Order)(Weldon, Elizabeth)
May 3, 2011 198 Featured Case ORDER granting 197 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sid Leach terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/3/11. (cm, )
May 2, 2011 197 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Substitution of Lead Counsel by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Ketan)
April 29, 2011 194 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 4/18/2011 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Maxwell,Telephone number: 903/892-8634. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2011. (pad, )
April 28, 2011 196 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew B Lowrie for CARBONITE, INC.. (cm, )
April 28, 2011 195 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin M Littman for CARBONITE, INC.. (fee paid) (cm, )
April 28, 2011 193 RESPONSE TO GO DADDYS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM CONCERNING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Oasis Research, LLC re 191 Notice (Other) OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO GO DADDY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM CONCERNING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (Packin, Tamir) Modified on 4/28/2011 (cm, ).
April 27, 2011 192 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Packin, Tamir)
April 26, 2011 191 GO DADDYS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM CONCERNING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION re: 104 (LaCorte, Brian) Modified on 4/28/2011 (cm, ).
April 21, 2011 190 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference and Trial setting set for 10/1/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2011. Discovery due by 10/28/2011. Expert Witness List due from Plaintiff by 3/2/2012 and from Defendant by 3/30/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2011. Mediation Completion due by 5/7/2012. Motions to Dismiss due by 9/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/21/11. (cm, )
April 18, 2011 189 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2011. (Court Reporter D. Maxwell.) (dm, )
April 18, 2011 188 Featured Case ORDER granting 185 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Replies due by 4/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/18/11. (cm, )
April 17, 2011 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Reply)(Parker, Greg)
April 15, 2011 186 NOTICE by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 attachment, # 2 attachment)(Chatterjee, Indra)
April 15, 2011 185 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 178 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Greg)
April 14, 2011 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LOCATION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Scheduling Conference set for Monday, April 18, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. will be held at the U. S. Courthouse and Federal Building, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090 (tls, )
April 12, 2011 184 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Packin, Tamir)
April 12, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order submitted by Oasis Research, LLC. Document not signed and wrong event used when filing. Correction should be made by one business day. (cm, )
April 11, 2011 183 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Oasis Research, LLC. (Packin, Tamir) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cm, ). Modified on 4/12/2011 (cm, ).
April 11, 2011 182 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott A Meyer (Meyer, Scott)
April 11, 2011 181 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adrive, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Adrive, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
April 8, 2011 180 Featured Case ORDER granting 179 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marvin Craig Tyler; Aden Martin Allen and Abraham DeLao terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/8/11. (cm, )
April 6, 2011 179 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
April 5, 2011 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Packin, Tamir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2011: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
March 25, 2011 177 NOTICE by Nirvanix, Inc. of Certificate of Interested Persons (Parker, Greg)
March 24, 2011 176 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nirvanix, Inc. (Parker, Greg)
March 23, 2011 175 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Greg)
March 14, 2011 174 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ketan S Vakil for PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (cm, )
March 14, 2011 173 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth M Weldon for PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (cm, )
March 10, 2011 172 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc. (LaCorte, Brian)
March 10, 2011 171 Certificate of Interested Persons (Jacks, Thomas) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cm, ).
March 10, 2011 170 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by PRO SOFTNET CORP. (Leach, Sid) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cm, ).
March 10, 2011 169 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Miller, Anthony) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cm, ).
March 10, 2011 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony P Miller on behalf of Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Miller, Anthony)
March 10, 2011 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul V Storm on behalf of Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
March 10, 2011 166 NOTICE by Oasis Research, LLC PLAINTIFF OASIS RESEARCH, LLC'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Packin, Tamir)
March 7, 2011 165 NOTICE by Oasis Research, LLC PLAINTIFF OASIS RESEARCH, LLCS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - In re Google, # 2 Exhibit - Red Hat, Inc. v. Bedrock Computer Techs., LLC.)(Packin, Tamir)
March 4, 2011 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy B Margolies on behalf of DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. (Margolies, Stacy)
February 24, 2011 163 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/23/11. (cm, )
February 24, 2011 162 Featured Case PRELIMINARY DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/23/11. (cm, )
February 23, 2011 161 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/11/2011., Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2011 01:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/23/11. (cm, )
February 23, 2011 160 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dmitriy Kheyfits for Oasis Research, LLC,Dmitriy Kheyfits for Oasis Research, LLC,Dmitriy Kheyfits for Oasis Research, LLC,Dmitriy Kheyfits for Oasis Research, LLC. (fee paid) (cm, )
February 9, 2011 159 NOTICE by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. of recent opinion (letter) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hawes, Clay)
January 25, 2011 158 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger D Sanders (Sanders, Roger)
January 11, 2011 157 NOTICE by PRO SOFTNET CORP. re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer - Precedential Order Issued in In Re Microsoft Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Precedential Order in In re Microsoft Corp.)(Leach, Sid)
January 6, 2011 156 NOTICE by Oasis Research, LLC NOTICE REGARDING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Kellman, Alan)
January 6, 2011 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re 138 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
December 27, 2010 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re 138 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
December 23, 2010 153 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts, 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Packin, Tamir)
December 23, 2010 152 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit P, # 10 Exhibit Q, # 11 Exhibit R, # 12 Exhibit S)(Packin, Tamir)
December 23, 2010 151 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION to Dismiss, 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N)(Packin, Tamir)
December 17, 2010 150 RESPONSE in Support re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Chatterjee, Indra)
December 17, 2010 149 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kassabian, Daniel)
December 17, 2010 148 RESPONSE in Support re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Kassabian, Daniel)
December 14, 2010 147 RESPONSE to 135 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,, Evidentiary Objections to Exhibit A Attached to the Declaration of Tamir Packin by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Leach, Sid)
December 14, 2010 146 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 93 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 12/14/10. (cm, )
December 14, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 145, Notice to be Refiled using the "Response to Non-Motion" event code. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
December 13, 2010 145 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by PRO SOFTNET CORP. re 135 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,, of Evidentiary Objections to Exhibit A Attached to the Declaration of Tamir Packin (Leach, Sid) Modified on 12/14/2010 (cm, ).
December 13, 2010 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Leach, Sid)
December 13, 2010 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
December 13, 2010 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts filed by CARBONITE, INC.. (Gutkoski, John)
December 13, 2010 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim filed by CARBONITE, INC.. (Gutkoski, John)
December 13, 2010 140 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Its Pending Motions by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/14/2010) (cm, ).
December 13, 2010 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
December 10, 2010 138 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaCorte, Brian)
December 9, 2010 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel N Kassabian on behalf of DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. (Kassabian, Daniel)
December 7, 2010 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., NetMass, Inc. (Lang, Shannon)
December 3, 2010 135 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts, 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts, 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference, 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer of Tamir Packin filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Packin, Tamir)
December 3, 2010 134 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts, 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts, 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference of Christopher M. Crawford filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Packin, Tamir)
December 3, 2010 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts, 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts, 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Packin, Tamir)
December 3, 2010 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Dismiss, 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Packin, Tamir) (Main Document 132 replaced on 12/6/2010) (fnt, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2010) (fnt, ).
November 30, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 117, MOTION to Sever Duplicates Document # 116. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
November 29, 2010 131 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc..(Tyler, Marvin)
November 29, 2010 130 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference, 93 MOTION to Dismiss, 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim. Responses due by 12/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/29/2010. (pad, )
November 24, 2010 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah, 93 MOTION to Dismiss, 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim, 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Packin, Tamir)
November 23, 2010 127 ANSWER to 83 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of AT&T, Inc. by Oasis Research, LLC.(Packin, Tamir)
November 23, 2010 126 ANSWER to 81 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Iron Mountain Inc. and Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. by Oasis Research, LLC.(Packin, Tamir)
November 22, 2010 128 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bruce C Piontkowski for Adrive, LLC. (fee paid) (cm, )
November 22, 2010 125 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts by CARBONITE, INC.. (Gutkoski, John)
November 22, 2010 124 MOTION to Sever The Claims Against Carbonite For Misjoinder And Transfer Those Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Massachusetts by CARBONITE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutkoski, John)
November 22, 2010 123 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.), 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts Jackie Su filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 122 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.), 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts David Krendel filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 121 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.), 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts Robert Mulcahy filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 120 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.), 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts of Christophe Culine filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 119 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.), 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts of Scott Caswell filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 118 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts, 117 MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) of Thomas R. Davis filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 117 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE D.E. 116 . PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Sever (Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Mass.) by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay) Modified on 11/30/2010 (cm, ).
November 22, 2010 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Claims to the U.S. District Court for the Dist. of Massachusetts by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay)
November 16, 2010 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. (Chatterjee, Indra)
November 16, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 114, NOTICE of Disclosure to be Refiled using the "Corporate Disclosure Statement" event. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
November 15, 2010 114 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE of Disclosure by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. DEFENDANTS EMC CORP., DECHO CORP., AND IOMEGA CORP.'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 (Chatterjee, Indra) Modified on 11/16/2010 (cm, ).
November 15, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Corporate Disclosure Statement #113 submitted by EMC Corp, Decho Corp, and Iomega Corp. The document did not have a certificate of service. Please make corrections and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (pad, )
November 12, 2010 113 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. (Chatterjee, Indra) Modified on 11/15/2010 (pad, ).
November 12, 2010 112 ***PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. PLEASE IGNORE*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer.. (Chatterjee, Indra) Modified on 11/15/2010 (pad, ).
November 12, 2010 111 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah by Christopher A. Hivick filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Chatterjee, Indra)
November 12, 2010 110 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah by Michael J. Collins filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Chatterjee, Indra)
November 12, 2010 109 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah by Vance Checketts filed by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Chatterjee, Indra)
November 12, 2010 108 MOTION to Dismiss For Misjoinder Or, In The Alternative, To Sever And Transfer Claims To The United States District Court For The District Of Utah by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (pad, ).
November 11, 2010 107 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer.. (Leach, Sid)
November 10, 2010 106 MOTION to Sever and Transfer by PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Leach, Sid)
November 10, 2010 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Iron Mountain Incorporated, Other Affiliate Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. for IRON MOUNTAIN, INC.; Other Affiliate Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. for Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 10, 2010 104 MOTION to Change Venue To the District Court of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue -and- Amended Certificate of Conference by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaCorte, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2010) (fnt, ).
November 10, 2010 103 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Nirvanix, Inc..(Parker, Greg)
November 9, 2010 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg Harlan Parker on behalf of Nirvanix, Inc. (Parker, Greg)
November 9, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue submitted by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. Certificate of Conference does not comply with LR CV-7(h). Correction should be made by one business day. (cm, )
November 9, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nirvanix, Inc. to 11/10/2010. (cm, )
November 9, 2010 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nirvanixs deadline to Answer or otherwise respond is extended from November 8, 2010 up to and including November 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/9/10. (cm, )
November 9, 2010 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp. (Findlay, Eric)
November 8, 2010 99 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Nirvanix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Heidi)
November 8, 2010 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Parker on behalf of Nirvanix, Inc. (Parker, Heidi)
November 8, 2010 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CARBONITE, INC. (Gutkoski, John)
November 8, 2010 96 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim by CARBONITE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutkoski, John)
November 8, 2010 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Godaddy.Com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Go Daddy Group, Inc. for Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian)
November 8, 2010 94 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Arizona, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal of Claims Against Go Daddy for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaCorte, Brian) Modified on 11/9/2010 (cm, ).
November 8, 2010 93 MOTION to Dismiss by DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra)
November 8, 2010 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jungle Disk, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rackspace Hosting, Inc. for Jungle Disk, LLC. (Tyler, Marvin)
November 8, 2010 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rackspace US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rackspace Hosting, Inc. for Rackspace US, Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin)
November 8, 2010 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rackspace Hosting, Inc. (Tyler, Marvin)
November 8, 2010 89 Defendants Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. and Jungle Disk LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and Defenses to Complaint by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc..(Tyler, Marvin)
November 8, 2010 88 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Oasis Research, LLC (Packin, Tamir)
November 8, 2010 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abraham DeLao on behalf of Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (DeLao, Abraham)
November 8, 2010 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aden Martin Allen on behalf of Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Allen, Aden)
November 8, 2010 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PRO SOFTNET CORP. (Leach, Sid)
November 8, 2010 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Inc. (Philbin, Phillip)
November 8, 2010 83 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Oasis Research, LLC by AT&T Inc..(Philbin, Phillip)
November 8, 2010 82 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by PRO SOFTNET CORP..(Leach, Sid)
November 5, 2010 81 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Oasis Research, LLC by Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., IRON MOUNTAIN, INC..(Hawes, Clay)
November 1, 2010 80 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Adrive, LLC.(Smith, Michael)
October 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PRO SOFTNET CORP. to 11/8/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
October 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Softlayer Technologies, Inc. to 11/8/2010. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
October 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adrive, LLC to 11/1/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
October 25, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 72 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys James Michael Young and Roger Sanders for Godaddy.Com, Inc.. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/25/10. (cm, )
October 25, 2010 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., and Jungle Disk, LLC shall have up to and including November 8, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/25/10. (cm, )
October 22, 2010 77 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PRO SOFTNET CORP..( Leach, Sid)
October 22, 2010 76 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Softlayer Technologies, Inc..( Miller, Anthony)
October 22, 2010 75 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adrive, LLC.( Smith, Michael)
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CARBONITE, INC. to 11/8/2010. 18 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
October 21, 2010 74 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CARBONITE, INC..( Flores, Michelle)
October 21, 2010 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Jungle Disk, LLC, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 10/21/2010 (cm, ).
October 20, 2010 72 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Roger)
October 12, 2010 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Oasis Research, LLC (Packin, Tamir)
October 12, 2010 70 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Oasis Research, LLC (Packin, Tamir)
October 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 68 & 69, Notice of Dismissal to be Refiled using the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Event Code. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
October 8, 2010 69 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Oasis Research, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Drive Headquarters, Inc. (Packin, Tamir) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cm, ).
October 8, 2010 68 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Oasis Research, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Netmass, Inc. (Packin, Tamir) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cm, ).
October 8, 2010 67 Oasis Research, LLC's ANSWER to 58 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Officeware Corp. d/b/a FilesAnywhere.com by Oasis Research, LLC.(Packin, Tamir)
September 27, 2010 66 Return of Service Executed as to Drive Headquarters, Inc. on 9/20/2010, answer due: 10/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service of Summons)(cm, )
September 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PRO SOFTNET CORP. to 10/28/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nirvanix, Inc. to 11/8/2010. (cm, )
September 27, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until and including November 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/27/10. (cm, )
September 24, 2010 64 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PRO SOFTNET CORP..( Leach, Sid)
September 24, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Iomega Corp. to 11/6/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 24, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for EMC CORP. to 11/6/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 24, 2010 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Officeware Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Immediatek, Inc. for Officeware Corp., Officeware Corp.. (Meyer, Scott)
September 24, 2010 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Gerald Jacks on behalf of Officeware Corp. (Jacks, Thomas)
September 23, 2010 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian W LaCorte for Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (fee paid) (cm, ) (Main Document 59 replaced on 9/24/2010) (cm, ).
September 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for DECHO Corp. to 11/6/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 23, 2010 58 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Oasis Research, LLC by Officeware Corp..(Meyer, Scott)
September 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adrive, LLC to 10/25/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CARBONITE, INC. to 10/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NetMass, Inc. to 10/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 22, 2010 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adrive, LLC.(Smith, Michael)
September 22, 2010 56 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NetMass, Inc..( Kaplan, Lee)
September 22, 2010 55 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DECHO Corp., EMC CORP., Iomega Corp..( Chatterjee, Indra)
September 22, 2010 54 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CARBONITE, INC..( Flores, Michelle)
September 22, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 42 , Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to be Refiled as an Application. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
September 21, 2010 61 Return of Service Executed as to PRO SOFTNET CORP. on 9/7/2010, answer due: 9/28/2010. (baf, )
September 21, 2010 60 Return of Service Executed as to Godaddy.Com, Inc. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (baf, )
September 21, 2010 53 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Nirvanix, Inc. by Nirvanix, Inc., Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tidwell, James)
September 20, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Inc. to 11/8/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 20, 2010 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc..( Cadwell, Kevin)
September 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Softlayer Technologies, Inc. to 10/25/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Godaddy.Com, Inc. to 11/8/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
September 15, 2010 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Softlayer Technologies, Inc.( Storm, Paul)
September 15, 2010 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony P Miller on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Miller, Anthony)
September 15, 2010 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul V Storm on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
September 15, 2010 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Godaddy.Com, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rackspace US, Inc. to 10/25/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( pad, )
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rackspace Hosting, Inc. to 10/25/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( pad, )
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jungle Disk, LLC to 10/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( pad, )
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. to 11/5/2010; NetMass, Inc. to 11/5/2010; IRON MOUNTAIN, INC. to 11/5/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( pad, )
September 14, 2010 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace US, Inc..( Tyler, Marvin)
September 14, 2010 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace Hosting, Inc..( Tyler, Marvin)
September 14, 2010 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jungle Disk, LLC.( Tyler, Marvin)
September 14, 2010 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., NetMass, Inc.(Hawes, Clay)
September 14, 2010 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., NetMass, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
September 14, 2010 42 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by NetMass, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 9/22/2010 (cm, ).
September 13, 2010 27 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Inc. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 41 Return of Service Executed as to Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 40 Return of Service Executed as to IRON MOUNTAIN, INC. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 39 Return of Service Executed as to NetMass, Inc. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 38 Return of Service Executed as to Rackspace US, Inc. on 9/2/2010, answer due: 9/23/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 37 Return of Service Executed as to Rackspace Hosting, Inc. on 9/2/2010, answer due: 9/23/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 36 Return of Service Executed as to Officeware Corp. on 9/2/2010, answer due: 9/23/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 35 Return of Service Executed as to Adrive, LLC on 9/2/2010, answer due: 9/23/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 34 Return of Service Executed as to Jungle Disk, LLC on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 33 Return of Service Executed as to Nirvanix, Inc. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 32 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Return of Service Executed as to IRON MOUNTAIN, INC. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, ) Modified on 9/14/2010 (cm, ).
September 9, 2010 31 Return of Service Executed as to DECHO Corp. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 30 Return of Service Executed as to CARBONITE, INC. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 29 Return of Service Executed as to Iomega Corp. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 28 Return of Service Executed as to EMC CORP. on 9/1/2010, answer due: 9/22/2010. (cm, )
September 9, 2010 26 Return of Service Executed as toSoftlayer Technologies, Inc. on 9/2/2010, answer due: 9/23/2010. (cm, )
September 1, 2010 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan Kellman for Oasis Research, LLC. (cm, )
September 1, 2010 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Desmarais for Oasis Research, LLC. (cm, )
September 1, 2010 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tamir Packin for Oasis Research, LLC. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 22 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tidwell, James)
August 31, 2010 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oasis Research, LLC (Tidwell, James)
August 31, 2010 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Rackspace US, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Rackspace Hosting, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to PRO SOFTNET CORP.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Officeware Corp.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nirvanix, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NetMass, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Jungle Disk, LLC. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to IRON MOUNTAIN, INC.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Iomega Corp.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Godaddy.Com, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to EMC CORP.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Drive Headquarters, Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to DECHO Corp.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CARBONITE, INC.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adrive, LLC. (cm, )
August 31, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (cm, )
August 30, 2010 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant Pursuant to a Standing Order. (cm, )
August 30, 2010 Case Assigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (cm, )
August 30, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc., Adrive, LLC, CARBONITE, INC., DECHO Corp., Drive Headquarters, Inc., EMC CORP., Godaddy.Com, Inc., IRON MOUNTAIN, INC., Iomega Corp., Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc., Jungle Disk, LLC, NetMass, Inc., Nirvanix, Inc., Officeware Corp., PRO SOFTNET CORP., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2646072.), filed by Oasis Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, # 3 Exhibit A-Patent '354, # 4 Exhibit B-Patent '228, # 5 Exhibit C-Patent '943, # 6 Exhibit D-Patent '051)(Tidwell, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/31/2010) (cm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Oasis Research, LLC v. Adrive, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oasis Research, LLC
Represented By: James Claud Tidwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrive, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBONITE, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Headquarters, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC CORP.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DECHO Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iomega Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godaddy.Com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRON MOUNTAIN, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetMass, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirvanix, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officeware Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO SOFTNET CORP.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace Hosting, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace US, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jungle Disk, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softlayer Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]