Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC v. Softlayer Technologies, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc., Match.com, Inc., AOL LLC and CME Group Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2009cv00269
Filed: June 16, 2009
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 881 FINAL JUDGMENT. Bedrock shall pay Yahoos costs in the amount of $115,500 in accordance with Bedrock and Yahoos Agreed Bill of Costs 844 . All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11(mll, )
September 30, 2011 880 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 842 Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorney Fees and Costs; denying 845 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11 (mll, )
September 28, 2011 879 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 878 Notice (Other) Yahoo!'s Response to Bedrock's Notice of Conclusion of Second Reexamination (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 20, 2011 878 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF SECOND REEXAMINATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 17, 2011 877 Featured Case ORDER approving payment for services rendered by technical advisor Richard Egan, Austin TX. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/11. (leh, )
July 26, 2011 876 7.26.11 Minute Entry - Post Verdict Hearing: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post-Verdict Motion Haring held on 7/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf, )
July 18, 2011 875 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
July 18, 2011 874 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
July 18, 2011 873 Featured Case ORDER granting 868 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity. ORDERED that Yahoo! is granted an extension of time through and including July 12, 2011, to file a reply in support of its Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity and Bedrock is granted an extension of time through and including July 18, 2011 to file a surreply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, )
July 18, 2011 872 Featured Case ORDER granting 869 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and For Attorneys' Fees and Costs. ORDERED that Yahoo! is granted an extension of time through and including July 12, 2011, to file a reply in support of its Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and For Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Dkt. No. 842] and Bedrock is granted an extension of time through and including July 18, 2011 to file a surreply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, )
July 12, 2011 871 RESPONSE in Support re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lee, John)
July 12, 2011 870 RESPONSE in Support re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 Yahoo!'s Reply ISO Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 8, 2011 869 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 (Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 8, 2011 868 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) (Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File A Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 7, 2011 867 Featured Case ORDER denying 865 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 866 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motions are denied without prejudice if parties can agree on a schedule where all replies and surreplies are filed no later than 7-18-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-07-11 (mll, )
July 6, 2011 866 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 6, 2011 865 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 1, 2011 864 RESPONSE in Opposition re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 30, 2011 863 RESPONSE in Opposition re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 30, 2011 862 NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Storm, Paul)
June 30, 2011 861 Sealed Transcript from Trial Proceedings 5/10/11. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 860 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 5/10/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 120 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 859 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/9/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 325 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 858 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/29/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 201 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 857 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/29/11 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 176 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 856 Sealed Transcript from 4/28/11 Afternoon Proceedings. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 855 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/28/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 180 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 854 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings Morning Session held on 4/28/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 181 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 853 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/27/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 198 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 30, 2011 852 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/27/11 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloaon/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 145 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, )
June 22, 2011 851 Featured Case ORDER granting 849 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 ; Responses due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/11. cc:attys 6-22-11 (mll, )
June 22, 2011 850 Featured Case ORDER granting 848 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) ; Responses due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/11. cc:attys 6-22-11 (mll, )
June 21, 2011 849 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
June 21, 2011 848 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
June 10, 2011 847 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 843 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
June 6, 2011 846 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent 5,893,120 - PX-1, # 2 Exhibit 14 - 1996 NRL IPv6 code key.c - DX-36, # 3 Exhibit 15 - NRL Source Code - key.h - DX-35, # 4 Exhibit 16 - Information Disclosure Statement - 6/2010 - DX-147C, # 5 Exhibit 17 - Information Disclosure Statement -12-2010 - DX-147E, # 6 Exhibit 18 - Transaction History for Patent Application - DX-147G, # 7 Exhibit 19 - USPTO Notice of Intent to Issue - DX-147F, # 8 Exhibit 20 - Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for the '120 Patent - DX-147H, # 9 Exhibit 21 - US. Patent 5,287,499 - DX-66, # 10 Exhibit 22 - Telcordia documents re: patent application - DX-56, # 11 Exhibit 23 - Yahoo!'s 2004 10K Annual Statement - PX-248)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 6, 2011 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Alexey Kuznetsov - DX-48, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Source Code - key.c - DX-37, # 4 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent 5,121,495 - DX-65, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Application Approval for Filing - DX-57, # 6 Exhibit 5 - U. S. Patent 6,119,214 - DX101, # 7 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent 4,996,663 - DX-64, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Donald Knuth, Sorting and Searching, vol. 3, of The Art of Computer Programming - DX-98, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Kruse, "Data Structures and Program Design" - DX-108, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Daniel F. Stubbs and Neil W. Webre, Data Structures with Abstract Data Types and Pascal - DX-118, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Kuznetsov email to Day re contact request - DX-436, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Absher email to Kuznetsov re Linux route.c question - DX-440, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Kuznetsov email to Absher re Linux route.c question - DX-441)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 6, 2011 844 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Yahoo!'s AGREED Bill of Costs)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 6, 2011 843 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Exh. 26 to B. James Decl ISO 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2011: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
June 6, 2011 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2011: # 27 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ).
June 6, 2011 841 Featured Case ORDER granting 839 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are granted an extension to 6-06-2011 to file any post-verdict motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/11. cc:attys 6-06-11 (mll, )
June 3, 2011 840 Featured Case ORDER granting 838 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Yahoo! shall file its Bill of Costs no later than 6-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/11. cc:attys 6-03-11 (mll, )
June 3, 2011 839 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Verdict Motions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 2, 2011 838 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Yahoo!'s Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
May 19, 2011 830 Featured Case ORDER granting 829 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc. The verdict rendered in this matter is VACATED and all claims for relief asserted by Bedrock against Google are DISMISSED with prejudice and all claims for relief asserted by Google against Bedrock are DISMISSED with prejudice. All atty's fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/18/11. cc:attys 5-19-11(mll, )
May 18, 2011 829 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Google, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 11, 2011 828 Featured Case ORDER that parties file all post-verdict motions by 6-03-2011. Any post-verdict motions will be heard 7-26-2011; set hearing on post-verdict motions for 7/26/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The page limits of Local Rule CV-7(a)(1) apply to all post-verdict briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, )
May 9, 2011 827 Featured Case ORDER granting 817 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims in this action by pltf against deft SofLayer Technologies Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counterclaims by deft against pltf are dismissed without prejudice; each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/09/11. cc:attys 5-10-11(mll, )
May 9, 2011 826 Featured Case ORDER granting 818 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Amazon.com Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/09/11. cc:attys 5-10-11(mll, )
May 9, 2011 825 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Laches) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 9, 2011 824 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
May 9, 2011 823 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law Regarding Damages by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
May 9, 2011 822 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s renewed Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Non-Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 9, 2011 821 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 9, 2011 820 Sealed Document. Declaration of Keith Ugone In Support of Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence Relevant to the Valuation of the Patent-In-Suit Relating to Intellectual Ventures and Acacia Research (Docket #802) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 9, 2011 819 Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Design-Arounds (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl., # 2 Errata Exh. A to B. James Decl., # 3 Affidavit Barrow Decl.)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 6, 2011 818 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Amazon.com, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 6, 2011 817 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to SoftLayer Technologies, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 4, 2011 816 Proposed Jury Instructions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Joint Proposed Jury Instructions)(Bright, Christopher)
May 4, 2011 815 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!s Amended Proposed Verdict Form (Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 3, 2011 812 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Redact the 4/12/2011 Afternoon Trial Transcript by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Menscher, # 2 Exhibit A - Transcript, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 29, 2011 814 4.29.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 (BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/29/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 29, 2011 809 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law Of No Willful Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 808 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law Regarding Damages by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 807 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Judgment Motion on Law regarding Non-Infringment by Yahoo! Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 29, 2011 805 Featured Case ORDER granting 799 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft MySpace Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11(mll, )
April 29, 2011 804 Featured Case ORDER granting 798 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft AOL Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11(mll, )
April 29, 2011 803 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of the Second Ex Parte Reexamination (Bright, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 802 Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence Relevant to Valuation of Patent-in-Suit Relating to Intellectual Ventures and Acacia Research. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Bright, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 801 Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Valuations by D. Garrod and R. Nemes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-1, # 5 Exhibit D-2, # 6 Exhibit D-3, # 7 Exhibit E)(Bright, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 800 Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Jonathan Koomey's Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Koomey Decl.)(Bright, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 811 4.28.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 2(BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/28/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 28, 2011 799 STIPULATION of Dismissal of MySpace Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
April 28, 2011 798 STIPULATION of Dismissal of AOL Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
April 28, 2011 797 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!'s Proposed Jury Verdict Form (Bright, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 796 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 27, 2011 813 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Presented during trial on 4.27.11(rlf, )
April 27, 2011 806 4.27.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 1 (BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/27/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, )
April 27, 2011 795 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Cawley, Douglas)
April 27, 2011 794 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR*** Exhibit List Defendant Yahoo!'s Cumulative List of Exhibits Admitted on April 27, 2011 by Yahoo! Inc... (Bright, Christopher) Modified on 4/28/2011 (kls, ).
April 27, 2011 793 Exhibit List (NINTH AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 27, 2011 792 ***Replaces Document 766 *** MOTION to Redact 676 Transcript,,, - Defendants' Motion to Redact Transcript (CORRECTED) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 4/27/2011 (gsg).
April 27, 2011 791 Exhibit List Google's Final List of All Admitted Exhibits by Google Inc... (Jones, Michael)
April 27, 2011 790 Featured Case ORDER granting 750 Motion for Leave to File. Defts are allowed to identify an expert to testify regarding reexamintion procedures before the US Patent and Trademark Office. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, )
April 27, 2011 789 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRETRIAL HEARING held on 4/26/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly J. Julian,Telephone number: 1-800-666-0763. (56 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2011. (tja, )
April 26, 2011 810 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2011, Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2011 re 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
April 26, 2011 788 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Verdict held on 4/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 6 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 787 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 107 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 786 Sealed Transcript. 4/14/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 785 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 111 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 784 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 183 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 783 Sealed Transcript. 4/13/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 782 Sealed Transcript. 4/13/11 Morning Session of Trial. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 781 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/13/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 182 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 780 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/13/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 61 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 779 Sealed Transcript. 4/12/11 Afternoon Session of Trial (sms, )
April 26, 2011 778 Sealed Transcript. 4/12/11 Morning Session of Trial. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 777 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/12/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 230 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 776 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/12/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 43 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 775 Sealed Transcript. 4/11/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 774 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/11/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 196 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 773 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/11/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 90 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, )
April 26, 2011 772 Featured Case ORDER granting 768 Sealed Patent Motion to Restrict Hours for Second Trial. The time limits stated apply to all issues in the case, whether tried to the jury or the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/26/11. (mjc, )
April 26, 2011 771 Featured Case ORDER granting 756 Sealed Patent Motion to Preclude Reliance on Documents and Facts Related to Performance Testing Produced by Yahoo After Close of Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 757 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray. GRANTED to the extent that Stephen Gray may supplement his expert report to address the spinlock theory; DENIED as to the remainder of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/26/11. cc:attys 4-26-11 (mll, )
April 26, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #766 Defendants' Motion to Redact Transcript submitted by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. DEFICIENCY: No Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by Next Business Day. (kls, )
April 26, 2011 770 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 768 Yahoo!'s Response to Bedrock's Motion to Restrict Hours for Second Trial SEALED PATENT MOTION TO RESTRICT HOURS FOR SECOND TRIAL filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
April 25, 2011 769 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Yahoo!'s Notice of Third Amended Trial Witness List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Exhibit B - Yahoo!'s Third Amended Trial Witness List)(Lee, John)
April 25, 2011 768 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO RESTRICT HOURS FOR SECOND TRIAL by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 25, 2011 767 RESPONSE in Opposition re 735 MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 25, 2011 766 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - DEFICIENT FOR CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE*** MOTION to Redact 676 Transcript,,, - Defendants' Motion to Redact Transcript by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kls, ).
April 25, 2011 765 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 753 Yahoo!'s Response in Opposition to Bedrock's Motion in Limine K SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bright, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2011: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
April 25, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY, 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray, 754 SEALED MOTION For Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Dr. Howard Cohen: Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
April 24, 2011 764 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Yahoo!'s Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Lee, John)
April 24, 2011 763 RESPONSE in Opposition re 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of B. James, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 24, 2011 762 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - SHOULD BE EMAILED IN TO BE ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #757*** Proposed Order SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray. (Bright, Christopher) Modified on 4/25/2011 (kls, ).
April 24, 2011 761 Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION Yahoo!'s Amended Supplemental Motions in Limine by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
April 22, 2011 760 TRIAL BRIEF In Support of Excluding All References to both Reexamination as Addressed in Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4, and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 'A' and 'I' by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher)
April 22, 2011 759 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR ADVERSE INFERENCE BASED ON SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low ISO Motion, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of February 9, 2011, Dep. of Dr. Mark Jones, # 3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of April 5, 2011 Dep. of Roy Weinstein, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Low, John)
April 22, 2011 758 Supplemental SEALED MOTION in Limine by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Weinstein Supp. Report, # 2 Exhibit Weinstein Depo Excerpt)(Bright, Christopher)
April 22, 2011 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 22, 2011 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A is a true and correct copy of a letter dated November 20, 2009 from Bedrocks counsel to Defendants counsel requesting documents, # 3 Exhibit B is a true and correct copy of a letter dated April 30, 2010 from Bedrocks counsel to Defendants counsel requesting documents, # 4 Exhibit C is a true and correct copy of a letter dated November 3, 2010 from Bedrocks counsel to Softlayers counsel noting Softlayers failure to produce documents related to server performance or testing, # 5 Exhibit D is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks 30(b)(6) Notice to Yahoo dated July 14, 2010, # 6 Exhibit E is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks 30(b)(6) Notice to Softlayer dated July 14, 2010, # 7 Exhibit F is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks Interrogatories No. 15-17 to Yahoo dated December 8, 2010, # 8 Exhibit G is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks Interrogatories No. 15-17 to Softlayer dated December 8, 2010, # 9 Exhibit H is a true and correct copy of an email chain between Bedrocks counsel to Yahoos counsel requesting 30(b)(6) witnesses dated Nov. 15, 2010, # 10 Exhibit I is a true and correct copy of a letter from Yahoos counsel to Bedrocks counsel dated December 6, 2010 confirming Yahoos 30(b)(6) witnesses, # 11 Exhibit J is a true and correct copy of Yahoos Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Fifth Set of Interrogatories dated January 12, 2011, # 12 Exhibit K is a true and correct copy of Softlayers Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Fifth Set of Interrogatories dated January 12, 2011, # 13 Exhibit L is a true and correct copy of Yahoos production, YAHOO00522352-53, produced on March 11, 2011, # 14 Exhibit M is a true and correct copy of Softlayers production, SOF0063880-3926, produced on April 21, 2011, # 15 Exhibit N is a true and correct copy of portions of the transcript from the motion hearing on April 4, 2011, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 22, 2011 755 Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. MARK JONES (DKT. NO. 667) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, John)
April 22, 2011 754 SEALED MOTION For Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Dr. Howard Cohen by Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
April 21, 2011 753 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
April 21, 2011 752 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 713 SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 21, 2011 751 RESPONSE in Opposition re 722 Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659)Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659)Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 21, 2011 750 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File - Defendants' Unopposed Renewed Motion for Leave to Serve an Expert Report Regarding Reexamination Procedures in teh United States Patent and Trademark Office by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of N. Godici, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
April 21, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #742 Motion to Exclude Evidence submitted by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. DEFICIENCY: No Certificate of Conference - See Local Rule CV-7(i). Correction should be made by Next Business Day. (kls, )
April 19, 2011 743 Featured Case ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $5,342.29 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 3-31-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $10,684.58. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/19/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, )
April 19, 2011 742 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
April 18, 2011 741 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 735 MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] Yahoo and Amazon Notice of Joinder re Weinstein Report (Bright, Christopher)
April 18, 2011 740 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to the Magistrate Judges Order on Yahoo!s motion to Strike the Late-Disclosed Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit N. Bennett Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
April 15, 2011 749 Defendant Google's Exhibit Lists Tendering During Trial (Bedrock v Google). (Main Document - Defendant's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Defendant's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Defendant's Final List of All Admitted Exhibits)(rlf, )
April 15, 2011 748 Plaintiff Bedrock's Exhibit Lists Tendered During Trial (Bedrock v Google). (Main Document - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 5)(rlf, )
April 15, 2011 747 Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY. (rlf, )
April 15, 2011 746 JURY VERDICT. (rlf, )
April 15, 2011 745 Jury Instructions. (rlf, )
April 15, 2011 744 4.15.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 4/15/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 14, 2011 739 4.14.2011 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 4 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/14/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 14, 2011 737 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Non-Infringement - RENEWED by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 14, 2011 736 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages - RENEWED by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 14, 2011 735 MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] by AOL Inc, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Karasik, Louis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
April 14, 2011 734 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 14, 2011 733 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Defendant Google Inc.'s Offer of Proof Concerning the Exclusion of Evidence of the Divorce Proceedings of David Garrod and Richard Nemes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Divorce Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit B - Garrod Depo Trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Prenuptial Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D-1 - Excerpt of Nemes Trans, # 5 Exhibit D-2 - Exceprt of Nemes Trans, # 6 Exhibit D-3 - Exceprt of Nemes Trans, # 7 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Weinstein Trans)(Jones, Michael)
April 13, 2011 738 4.13.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/13/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 13, 2011 730 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DAUBERT MOTION AGAINST MARK JONES (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 13, 2011 729 Exhibit List (Ninth Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 12, 2011 732 4.12.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 2 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/12/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 12, 2011 728 SEALED MOTION Google's Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 12, 2011 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 12, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 715 Sealed Motion. DOCUMENT REPLACED BY 722 Sealed Motion. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
April 12, 2011 726 NOTICE by AOL Inc re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of Judge Love's Order Denying Summary Judgment Regarding the Legal Issue of Whether Mere Capability is Sufficient for Infringement of Claims 1-2 of the '120 Patent (Dacus, Deron)
April 12, 2011 725 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Godici Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit A - Godici CV, # 3 Exhibit B - Case Experience, # 4 Exhibit C - List of Materials Considered)(Jones, Michael)
April 12, 2011 724 Exhibit List (Eighth Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 12, 2011 723 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 11, 2011 731 4.11.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 1(BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/11/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 11, 2011 722 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 715 .***Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A of Low Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B-1 of Low Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B-2 of Low Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C of Low Declaration, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion)(Low, John) Modified on 4/12/2011 (mjc, ).
April 11, 2011 721 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON DEFENDANTS COMBINED DAUBERT AND RULE 26(A) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. MARK JONES (DKT. NO. 657) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A to Low Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion)(Low, John)
April 11, 2011 720 Joint SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration Of And Objections To Judge Love's Order Denying, In Part, Defendants' Motion To Exclude and/or Strike Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Louis A. Karasik In Support of Defendants' Objections To And Motion For Reconsideration Of Judge Love's Order Denying Motion to Strike Expert Report of Roy Weinstein (DOC.#656), # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). Modified on 4/12/2011 (kls, ).
April 11, 2011 719 Exhibit List - 5th Amended by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google's 5th Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2011 718 Exhibit List (Seventh Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 9, 2011 716 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude and/or Strike the Supplemental Expert Report and Opinion of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A- Koomey Statement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 8, 2011 715 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 722 .*** SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 3 Exhibit B-1of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 4 Exhibit B-2 of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 5 Exhibit C of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Low, John) Modified on 4/12/2011 (mjc, ).
April 8, 2011 714 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC to 710 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 8, 2011 713 SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Alton Absher, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from 3-17-11 Motions Hearing, # 3 Exhibit B - MSJ re Invalidity Presentation, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of route.c file from Linux kernel v2.0.1, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Williams Expert Report, # 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeffay w/attached Expert Report, # 7 Exhibit F - Excerpts from Jones Rebuttal Expert Report re Validity, # 8 Exhibit G - Excerpts from Alexey Kuznetsov Depo Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - Excerpts from Jones Expert Report re Infringement, # 10 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Jones Depo Transcript, # 11 Exhibit J - Emails between Kuznetsov and Absher, # 12 Exhibit K - Bedrock's ICs to Softlayer re RHEL 5, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
April 7, 2011 712 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by E Danielle Thompson Williams re 676 Transcript,,,. (Williams, E Danielle)
April 7, 2011 711 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/07/11. cc:attys 4-07-11(mll, )
April 6, 2011 710 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Trial Brief) - Google Inc.'s Identification of Two Documents and Related Testimony It Would Offer at Trial in Response to Bedrock's New Damages Theory [CORRECTED VERSION]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defs Ex. 184, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Chavey Depo Trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Defs Ex. 190, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Waychison Depo Trans)(Jones, Michael)
April 5, 2011 709 Featured Case ORDER denying 694 Sealed Patent Motion to Preclude Testimony from Lucas Pereira at Trial; granting 697 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File One Additional Motion in Limine After the Deadline. The Court also grants the motion in limine, precluding any evidence, testimony, or references to alleged unethical or controversial actions by Google that may implicate or may have implicated personal privacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/05/11. cc:attys 4-06-11 (mll, )
April 5, 2011 708 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 710 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Trial Brief) - Google Inc.'s Identification of Two Documents and Related Testimony It Would Offer at Trial in Response to Bedrock's New Damages Theory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defs Ex. 184, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Chavey depo trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Defs Ex. 190, # 4 Exhibit D - Exceprts of Waychison depo trans)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2011 (gsg).
April 5, 2011 707 Featured Case ORDER denying 667 Motion to Strike 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY ; granting 693 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/5/2011. (gsg)
April 5, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set to discuss trial exhibits for 4/26/2011 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
April 4, 2011 717 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2011 re 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 667 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (mjm )
April 4, 2011 706 Sealed Document. Panel A - Bedrock v Google: Jury Questionnaires 1-7; (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaires 8-14, # 2 Jury Questionnaires 15-21)(rlf, )
April 4, 2011 705 Sealed Document. Panel B - Bedrock v Softlayer: Jury Questionnaires - 1-7; (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaires - 8-14, # 2 Jury Questionnaires - 15-21)(rlf, )
April 4, 2011 704 4.4.11 Jury Selection Bedrock v Google (Panel A) Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 4, 2011 703 4.4.11 Jury Selection - Bedrock v Softlayer, et al (Panel B) Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 4, 2011 702 Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Defendants' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Lee, John)
April 4, 2011 701 3rd Amended Trial Witness List Witness List by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - 3rd Amended Trial Witness LIst)(Jones, Michael)
April 4, 2011 700 Exhibit List 3rd Amended Trial Exhibit List by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Google's 3rd Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael)
April 4, 2011 699 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - Google's 1st set of ROGS, # 3 Exhibit B - Bedrock's Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 4 Exhibit C - Bedrock's 1st Supp Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from 10/7/10 Hrg Transcript, # 6 Exhibit E - Bedrock's 1st Supp Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 7 Exhibit F - Bedrock's Consolidated Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 8 Exhibit G - Google Bates Labeled Docs, # 9 Exhibit H - 11/3/10 email from Briggs to Curry, # 10 Exhibit I - 1/4/11 email from Pennypacker to Cassady, # 11 Exhibit J - Google's Resp to 6th set of ROGS, # 12 Exhibit K - 3/30/11 excerpts of Waychison rough trans, # 13 Exhibit L - 3/29/11 excerpts of Pereira rough trans, # 14 Exhibit M - 3/31/11 email from Aurents to Briggs, # 15 Exhibit N - 3/29/11 excerpts of Chavey rough trans, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 4, 2011 698 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A- Google's Trial Witness List, # 3 Exhibit B - Google's Amended Trial Witness List, # 4 Exhibit C - Google's 3rd Amended Trial Witness List, # 5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Amended Initial Disclosures, # 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Second Amended Initial Disclosures, # 7 Exhibit F - Bates Labeled Documents, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2011 697 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File One Additional Motion in Limine After the Deadline for Motions in Limine by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google MIL No. 17, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2011 696 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S NOTICE OF CONVENANT NOT TO SUE GOOGLE, INC. FOR CERTAIN CLAIMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 1, 2011 695 Featured Case ORDER that Google respond to 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, and 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Google shall respond to both motions no later than 12:00 p.m. CST on 4-04-2011. In addition, both motions are set to be heard at the pretrial hearing on 4-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11(mll, )
March 31, 2011 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 31, 2011 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan A. Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 31, 2011 692 Featured Case ORDER denying 669 Sealed Motion to Strike Bedrock's Late-Disclosed Expert Opinion on Bedrock's Infringement Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, )
March 31, 2011 691 Featured Case ORDER granting 664 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting 666 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein; denying 668 Motion for Leave to Serve an Expert Report Regarding Reexamination Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, )
March 31, 2011 690 REPLY to Response to Motion re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration filed by AOL Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
March 31, 2011 689 Featured Case HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11(mll, )
March 31, 2011 688 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 666 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING, 686 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, of Joinder (Williams, E Danielle)
March 30, 2011 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Hotline Conference Call held on 3/30/2011. (Court Reporter M. Morris.) (mjm, )
March 30, 2011 687 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 669 SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE BEDROCKS LATE-DISCLOSED EXPERT OPINION ON BEDROCKS INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TAKE LIMITED EXPERT DISCOVERY ON THIS LATE-DISCLOSED OPINION filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 686 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 666 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING filed by AOL Inc, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - "An Analytical Solution...", # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 30, 2011 685 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 664 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE J filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 30, 2011 684 RESPONSE in Opposition re 668 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Serve an Expert Report for Reexamination Procedures in the United States Patent and TrademarkOffice filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 683 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 681 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Authorization to File Under Seal)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 682 RESPONSE in Opposition re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 681 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 667 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 680 Featured Case ORDER regarding Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11(mll, )
March 30, 2011 679 Featured Case ORDER granting 567 Motion for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays; granting 568 Motion for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays. GRANTED to the extent the Court discussed trial dates at the 3-24-2011 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11 (mll, )
March 30, 2011 678 Featured Case ORDER denying 570 Sealed Motion for Separate Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11 (mll, )
March 30, 2011 677 Sealed Transcript. (rem, )
March 30, 2011 676 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 3/17/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: D. Keith Johnson,Telephone number: (903) 533-1172. (166 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (tja, )
March 30, 2011 675 Featured Case ORDER re 627 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING (DKT. NO. 542) AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc. The Court will carry the above Motion and Objections to consider along with evidence to be presented at trial. Any time dedicated to the presentation of evidence on standing will be subtracted from the overall time allotted to each side for trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11(mll, )
March 29, 2011 674 REPLY to Response to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 29, 2011 673 RESPONSE to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE, 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine ADDITIONAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #4 [DKT. NO. 604] AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE A AND I [DKT. NO. 587] filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Capoccia, Rachel)
March 29, 2011 672 Featured Case HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/11. cc:attys 3-29-11(mll, )
March 29, 2011 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Hotline conference call held on 3/29/2011. (Court Reporter M. Morris.) (mjm, )
March 28, 2011 Jury Selection set for 4/4/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis for the Softlayer trial. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2011 12:30PM before Judge Leonard Davis for the Google trial. (mll, )
March 28, 2011 671 Featured Case ORDER setting trial time limits. Voir dire for the Softlayer trial will begin at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Leonard Davis. Voir dire for the Google trial will begin at 12:30 p.m., also before Judge Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-29-11(mll, )
March 28, 2011 670 Featured Case ORDER denying in part 587 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting in part 604 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-29-11 (mll, ) Modified on 3/29/2011 (mll, ).
March 28, 2011 669 SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE BEDROCKS LATE-DISCLOSED EXPERT OPINION ON BEDROCKS INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TAKE LIMITED EXPERT DISCOVERY ON THIS LATE-DISCLOSED OPINION by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!'s Motion to Strike, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John C. Low In Support of Yahoo!s Motion to Strike or Take Limited Expert Discovery, # 3 Exhibit A to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 4 Exhibit B1 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 5 Exhibit B2 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 6 Exhibit C1 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 7 Exhibit C2 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 8 Exhibit D to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 9 Exhibit E to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 10 Exhibit F to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 11 Exhibit G to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 12 Exhibit H to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion)(Low, John)
March 28, 2011 668 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Serve an Expert Report for Reexamination Procedures in the United States Patent and TrademarkOffice by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Lien, # 2 Exhibit A - USPTO Notice of Intent, # 3 Exhibit B - Form PTO 1449, # 4 Exhibit C - Order re Request for Ex Parte Reexam, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 28, 2011 667 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - Email from A. Hendershot, # 3 Exhibit B - Supplemental Report of Jones, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 28, 2011 666 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 28, 2011 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2011: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
March 28, 2011 664 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE J by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 28, 2011 663 Featured Case ORDER granting 647 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims for relief asserted between pltf and deft Match.com LLC are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-28-11(mll, )
March 28, 2011 662 Featured Case ORDER granting 661 Sealed Patent Motion to File One Additional Motion in Limine. Exhibit A shall be refiled as a motion. Defts shall respond no later than 3-30-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-28-11 (mll, )
March 25, 2011 661 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ONE ADDITIONAL MOTION IN LIMINE AFTER THE DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 25, 2011 660 Featured Case ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 587 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 604 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, )
March 25, 2011 659 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied; and 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11(mll, )
March 25, 2011 658 Featured Case ORDER setting pre-trial deadlines. If the parties find the need for an additional pre-trial hearing, the parties shall notify the Court no later than 3-30-2011. If a hearing is necessary, the parties shall submit an agenda of the matters to be heard at the pre-trial hearing to be held on 4-04-2011 at 2:30 p.m. The agenda shall be submitted no later than 3-30-2011. If there are any motions to be heard on 4-04-2011 that are not already before the Court,such motions shall be filed no later than 3-28-2011, and any responses shall be filed by 3-30-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, )
March 25, 2011 657 Featured Case ORDER denying 558 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, )
March 24, 2011 655 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2011. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
March 23, 2011 654 Featured Case ORDER granting 635 Motion to Withdraw Motions in Limine. Defts' Amended Motions in Limine Numbers Two and Nine (contained in 604 Motion in Limine) are hereby withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 653 Featured Case ORDER sealing 629 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11(mll, )
March 23, 2011 652 Featured Case ORDER granting 636 Motion for Entry of Stipulation of the Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 651 Featured Case ORDER granting 583 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Serve Late Response to Yahoo!'s Request for Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 650 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 590 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 649 Featured Case ORDER granting 644 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline for Three Fact Witness Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 648 Featured Case ORDER granting 637 Agreed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, )
March 23, 2011 647 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Match.com, LLC by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
March 23, 2011 646 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Objections to Plaintiff's Counter Deposition Designations by Defendants, SoftLayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., and AOL Inc.)(Low, John)
March 23, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 641 , Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT DOCKET EVENT.*** (mjc, )
March 23, 2011 645 Sealed Document. Defendants' Notice of Corrected Exhibits 8 and 9 to Amended Motions in Limine (Docket #604). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9)(Bright, Christopher)
March 23, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 631 , Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED AS A SEALED DOCUMENT.*** (mjc, )
March 23, 2011 644 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline for 3 Fact Witness Depositions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 23, 2011 643 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Google's 2nd Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael)
March 23, 2011 642 Featured Case ORDER granting 589 Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine. Defts are granted leave to file eleven Motions in Limine to be heard at the Pre-trial Conference on 3-24-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, )
March 22, 2011 641 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 579 Proposed Pretrial Order,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J to Proposed Joint Pretrial Order; Objections by Defendants, SoftLayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., and AOL Inc.)(Low, John) Modified on 3/23/2011 (mjc, ).
March 22, 2011 640 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit G, # 18 Exhibit H, # 19 Exhibit I, # 20 Exhibit J, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit L, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 22, 2011 639 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 589 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine (Notice Regarding Defendants' Motions In Limine) (Doan, Jennifer)
March 22, 2011 638 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, of Filing Exhibits to Proposed Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Objections to Amended Counter Depo Designations, # 2 Exhibit N - Objections to 2nd Amended Trial Witness List)(Jones, Michael)
March 22, 2011 637 Agreed MOTION in Limine (Agreed Motions in Limine) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 22, 2011 636 Joint MOTION For Entry Of Stipulation Of The Parties by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 22, 2011 635 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Defendants' Motions In Limine Numbers Two and Nine) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 22, 2011 634 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-2, # 2 Exhibit I)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 22, 2011 633 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-2, # 2 Exhibit I)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 22, 2011 632 RESPONSE in Opposition re 553 MOTION to Dismiss GOOGLE INC.'S AND MATCH.COM, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS (DKT. NOS. 476 AND 477) filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 22, 2011 631 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Corrected Exhibits 8 and 9 to Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9)(Bright, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2011 (mjc, ).
March 22, 2011 630 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 629 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Low ISO Yahoo!'s Motion in Opposition to Bedrock Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions, # 2 Exhibit A to Low Dec. ISO Yahoo!'s Motion in Opposition to Bedrock Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions)(Low, John)
March 22, 2011 628 Exhibit List (Amended) by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Amended Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael)
March 22, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 624 , Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
March 21, 2011 627 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING (DKT. NO. 542) AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 21, 2011 626 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Notice of Filing Additional Attachments to Final PreTrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Lee, John)
March 21, 2011 625 RESPONSE to 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC's Exhibit List by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Capoccia, Rachel)
March 21, 2011 624 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, 618 Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Exhibit L)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2011 (mjc, ).
March 21, 2011 623 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF ESTIMATED TRIAL TIME (Cassady, Jason)
March 21, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #616 - Exhibit List submitted by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. DEFICIENCY: Incorrect Docket Event used. Correction should be made by Next Business Day. (kls, )
March 21, 2011 622 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Estimated Trial Time (Williams, E Danielle)
March 19, 2011 621 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit M)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 19, 2011 620 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit M)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 18, 2011 619 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Objections to Plaintiff's Pre-trial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
March 18, 2011 618 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 578 Proposed Pretrial Order,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M)(Jones, Michael)
March 18, 2011 617 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants Objections and Counter Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Lee, John)
March 18, 2011 616 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - WRONG DOCKET EVENT - TO BE REFILED*** Exhibit List (Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC's Pre-Trial Disclosures-Exhibit List) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Capoccia, Rachel) Modified on 3/21/2011 (kls, ).
March 18, 2011 615 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Austin D Tarango for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
March 18, 2011 614 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J Bramhall for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
March 18, 2011 613 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 612 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Corrected Amended Exhibit B to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Lee, John)
March 18, 2011 612 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, - Notice of Amended Exhibit B to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Williams, E Danielle)
March 18, 2011 Slides presented during the 3/17/11 Motions Hearing forwarded to the Tyler Exhibit Room. (mjm, )
March 17, 2011 611 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2011 re 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Court Reporter Keith Johnson.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
March 17, 2011 610 Featured Case ORDER granting 600 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/17/11. cc:attys 3-18-11 (mll, )
March 17, 2011 609 Featured Case ORDER that deft Yahoo file a response re 583 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE LATE RESPONSE TO YAHOO!'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW ITS DEEMED ADMISSIONS TO YAHOO!'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC; Response due 3-22-2011 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/17/11. cc:attys 3-18-11(mll, )
March 17, 2011 608 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Whitehurst, Alan)
March 16, 2011 607 Proposed Jury Instructions by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bright, Christopher)
March 16, 2011 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re 589 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
March 16, 2011 605 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) Modified on 3/28/2011 (mll, ).
March 16, 2011 603 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Daniel Powell on behalf of Google Inc., Match.Com LLC (Powell, Michael)
March 16, 2011 602 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S NOTICE OF COVENANT NOT TO SUE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 601 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Jones, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 600 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capoccia, Rachel)
March 16, 2011 599 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A to Exhibit B, # 4 Appendix B to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 598 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A to Exhibit B, # 4 Appendix B to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 15, 2011 597 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. BEDROCK'S PRELIMINARY PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND BENCH-TRIAL ISSUES REGARDING BEDROCK'S OWNERSHIP OF U.S. PATENT NO, 5,893,120 (Cawley, Douglas)
March 15, 2011 596 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND PROPOSED LIST OF BENCH-TRIAL ISSUES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF LACHES (Cawley, Douglas)
March 15, 2011 595 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING LACHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Bright, Christopher)
March 15, 2011 594 Featured Case ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $1,511.25 to Richard Egan, for services rendered and expenses incurred through 2-28-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $3,022.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, )
March 15, 2011 593 Featured Case ORDER granting 584 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 3-15-2011 to file Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on the issue of Laches. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, )
March 15, 2011 592 Featured Case ORDER granting 585 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, )
March 15, 2011 591 Featured Case ORDER that Bedrock file their response to defts' Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine by 3-18-2011, 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, )
March 15, 2011 590 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motions in Limine to Exclude Inadmissable Evidence by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
March 15, 2011 589 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher)
March 14, 2011 588 RESPONSE in Opposition re 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 14, 2011 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) Modified on 3/29/2011 (mll, ).
March 14, 2011 586 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Cassady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 14, 2011 585 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
March 14, 2011 584 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law on the Issue of Laches by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
March 14, 2011 583 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE LATE RESPONSE TO YAHOO!'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW ITS DEEMED ADMISSIONS TO YAHOO!'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Cassady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 14, 2011 582 Featured Case ORDER granting 577 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Bedrock to file its findings of fact and conclusions of law is extended to 3-15-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, )
March 14, 2011 581 Featured Case ORDER granting 572 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, )
March 14, 2011 580 Featured Case ORDER denying 571 Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Emergency Motion for a Separate Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, )
March 12, 2011 579 Proposed Pretrial Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 11, 2011 578 Proposed Pretrial Order FOR GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 7 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ).
March 11, 2011 577 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 576 Sealed Document by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 11, 2011 576 Sealed Document. Proposed Statements of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Plaintiff's Lack of Ownership of U.S. Patent 5,893,120. (Briggs, Todd)
March 11, 2011 575 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Identification of Prior Art Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Briggs, Todd)
March 11, 2011 574 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan James In Support of Defendants' Reply to Bedrock's Response In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A to James Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to James Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to to James Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to to James Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to to James Declaration)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
March 11, 2011 573 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan Whitehurst, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Whitehurst, Alan)
March 11, 2011 572 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 11, 2011 571 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding AOL & MySpace's Sealed Emergency Motion for a Separate Trial by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 11, 2011 570 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Separate Trial Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Love's Trial Plan Order [Dkt. No. 540] by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 11, 2011 569 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Pearson, Daniel)
March 11, 2011 568 Unopposed MOTION from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 11, 2011 567 MOTION for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holiday by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 10, 2011 566 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 564 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Low Decl. in Support of Dkt. No. 564)(Low, John)
March 10, 2011 565 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 564 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Low, John)
March 10, 2011 564 REPLY to Response to Motion re 473 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss re Plaintiff's Claim of Willful Patent Infringement)(Low, John)
March 10, 2011 563 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF TRIAL OPTION (Cawley, Douglas)
March 10, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones, 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein: Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
March 10, 2011 562 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G to Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit H to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Ugone Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A to Ugone Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 10, 2011 561 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit C to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit D to Pennypacker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit E to Pennypacker Declaration, # 5 Exhibit F to Pennypacker Declaration)(Gardner, Allen)
March 10, 2011 560 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (part 1 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A (part 2 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A (part 3 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration)(Gardner, Allen)
March 10, 2011 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
March 9, 2011 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Briggs Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration, # 5 Jeffay Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A to Jeffay Declaration, # 7 Schultz Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A to Schultz Declaration, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 9, 2011 557 Featured Case ORDER re 551 Notice of filing Joint Juror Questionnaire filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc. The Questionnaire is approved and shall be mailed to the venire panel along with the summons for completion prior to the scheduled 4-04-2011 jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11(mll, )
March 9, 2011 556 Featured Case ORDER granting 555 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, )
March 8, 2011 555 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 8, 2011 554 Featured Case ORDER adopting 372 Report & Recommendations and denying 283 Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness; adopting 369 Memorandum Opinion and Order of the Magistrate Judge, with clarifications; denying 431 Sealed Motion for Reconsideration. All objections are overruled. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11 (mll, )
March 7, 2011 553 MOTION to Dismiss GOOGLE INC.'S AND MATCH.COM, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS (DKT. NOS. 476 AND 477) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 552 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Second Amended Trial Witness List (Low, John)
March 7, 2011 551 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Filing of Joint Juror Questionnaire) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 7, 2011 550 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 2/16/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christy Humphries, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 533-1172. (79 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2011. (tja, )
March 7, 2011 549 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank G Smith, III on behalf of AOL Inc, MySpace Inc. (Smith, Frank)
March 7, 2011 547 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 546 ANSWER to 472 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 545 ANSWER to 476 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 544 ANSWER to 477 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 543 ANSWER to 471 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
March 4, 2011 Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love, regarding Motions to Exclude Testimony (per 548 Order). (mll, )
March 4, 2011 548 Featured Case ORDER granting 485 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to File Daubert and Rule 26(a) Motions to Exclude Testing Testimony of Bedrock's Expert Dr. Mark Jones; granting 486 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to File a Motion to Exclude, or in the alternative, to Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. The briefing schedule for the above discussed motions shall be expedited. Defts shall file their Motions no later than 3-09-2011; Bedrock shall respond no later than 3-14-2011; both motions are set for hearing on 3-17-2011 at 9:00 a.m. Denying 480 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to file a motion to strike any evidence or argument offered by Google Inc relating to the availability of non-infringing alternatives; however, Google is ordered to produce Laurent Chavey for an additional three hours of deposition to discuss the allegedly non-infringing code implemented by Google; 484 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to file a Motion to Exclude Capability Testimony of Dr Mark Jones - remains under further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-07-11(mll, )
March 4, 2011 542 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-07-11(mll, )
March 4, 2011 541 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit 18)(Jones, Michael)
March 2, 2011 540 Featured Case ORDER setting trial procedure in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-02-11(mll, )
March 2, 2011 539 Featured Case ORDER denying 505 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 507 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; denying 508 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying as moot 509 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-02-11 (mll, )
March 2, 2011 538 RESPONSE to 469 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 2, 2011 537 RESPONSE to 470 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 2, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120, 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent: Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
March 1, 2011 536 RESPONSE in Opposition re 505 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to File AOL's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 1, 2011 535 Featured Case ORDER granting 527 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, )
February 28, 2011 534 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Declaration of Dr. Mark Jones, # 10 Exhibit 1, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 28, 2011 533 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2011: # 4 Declaration of Dr. Mark Jones) (kls, ).
February 28, 2011 532 RESPONSE in Opposition re 473 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 28, 2011 531 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 28, 2011 530 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 28, 2011 529 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
February 28, 2011 528 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 28, 2011 527 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 28, 2011 526 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. - Notice of Service of Amazon.com Inc.'s Second Amended Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle)
February 28, 2011 525 NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. - Notice of Service of Softlayer Technologies, Inc's Second Amended Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle)
February 25, 2011 524 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
February 25, 2011 523 RESPONSE to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, - Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle)
February 25, 2011 522 NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Of Amended Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis)
February 25, 2011 521 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL Inc Of Amended Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis)
February 25, 2011 520 REPLY to Response to Motion re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
February 25, 2011 519 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Service of 2nd Amended Trial Witness Lists (Jones, Michael)
February 23, 2011 518 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 23, 2011 517 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 23, 2011 516 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 23, 2011 515 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 23, 2011 514 Featured Case ORDER adopting 352 Memorandum Opinion and Order of the US Magistrate Judge, and denying 377 Sealed Patent Motion for reconsideration. All objections are overruled and all motions for reconsideration are denied. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, )
February 23, 2011 513 Featured Case ORDER granting 497 Motion for Extension of Time. The Mediation deadline is extended to 3-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, )
February 23, 2011 512 Featured Case ORDER granting 506 Motion to Expedite. Pltf shall respond to AOL's Motion for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 3-01-2011. AOL's reply will be due by 3-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, )
February 22, 2011 511 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 22, 2011 510 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING REBUTTAL TRIAL WITNESS LIST (Cawley, Douglas)
February 22, 2011 509 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 22, 2011 508 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations to File Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 22, 2011 507 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan L. Whitehurst, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 22, 2011 506 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Its Emergency Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 22, 2011 505 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to File AOL's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 22, 2011 504 NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Karasik, Louis)
February 21, 2011 503 NOTICE by Match.Com LLC of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Briggs, Todd)
February 21, 2011 502 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Briggs, Todd)
February 21, 2011 501 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. of Compliance Regarding Yahoo Inc.'s Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Low, John)
February 21, 2011 500 NOTICE by AOL Inc of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Whitehurst, Alan)
February 21, 2011 499 NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Heartfield, J)
February 21, 2011 498 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. of Compliance regarding Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Heartfield, J)
February 21, 2011 497 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 21, 2011 496 Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 18, 2011 495 Featured Case ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $2,047.50 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 1-31-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $4,095.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11(mll, )
February 18, 2011 494 Featured Case ORDER that parties submit a proposed jury questionnaire of no more than one page to the Court by 3-07-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11(mll, )
February 18, 2011 493 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 347 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11 (mll, )
February 17, 2011 492 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
February 16, 2011 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 2/16/2011, Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2011 re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Match.com, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc. (Court Reporter Christy Humphries.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (mjm, )
February 15, 2011 490 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and denying as moot 364 Motion for Leave to Depose Third-Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, )
February 15, 2011 489 Featured Case ORDER granting 482 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, )
February 15, 2011 488 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) (Doan, Jennifer)
February 15, 2011 487 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. re 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Heartfield, J)
February 14, 2011 486 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 14, 2011 485 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 14, 2011 484 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whitehurst, Alan)
February 14, 2011 483 ***DISREGARD. SEE ENTRY 484 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal)(Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 2/15/2011 (gsg).
February 14, 2011 482 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 481 RESPONSE in Opposition re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
February 14, 2011 480 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 479 RESPONSE to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
February 11, 2011 478 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Service of Amended Trial Witness List (Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2011 477 ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2011 476 ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2011 475 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Compliance Regarding Trial Witness List (Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2011 474 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Amended Trial Witness List (Low, John)
February 10, 2011 473 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Low, John)
February 10, 2011 472 ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by AOL Inc.(Whitehurst, Alan)
February 10, 2011 471 Defendant MySpace Inc.'s ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by MySpace Inc..(Karasik, Louis)
February 10, 2011 470 ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, by Amazon.com Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
February 10, 2011 469 ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
February 10, 2011 468 NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis)
February 10, 2011 467 NOTICE by AOL Inc AOL Trial Witness List (Whitehurst, Alan)
February 10, 2011 466 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. - Notice of Compliance Regarding Amazon.com Inc.'s Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle)
February 10, 2011 465 NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. - Notice of Compliance re Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle)
February 9, 2011 464 Featured Case ORDER granting 461 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/9/11. (mjc, )
February 8, 2011 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl. ISO MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 to B. James Decl., # 3 Affidavit Cohen Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit Exh. A to Cohen Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 5 Affidavit S. Gray Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 6 Errata Exh, 1 to Gray Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 7 Affidavit K. Jeffay Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 8 Exhibit Exh, A to Jeffay Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
February 8, 2011 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan L. Whitehurst in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 8, 2011 461 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 8, 2011 460 Featured Case ORDER granting 457 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Bedrock to file its response to defts' Objections to the Report and Recommendations is extended to 2-14-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, )
February 8, 2011 459 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Curry, John)
February 7, 2011 458 REPLY to Response to Motion re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
February 7, 2011 457 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 7, 2011 456 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Filing Collateral Proceeding Pursuant to Local Rule 42(a)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 7, 2011 455 Featured Case ORDER granting 453 Sealed Patent Document, Joint Stipulation and Request for Order Regarding Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/7/11. (mjc, )
February 4, 2011 454 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Jones, Michael)
February 4, 2011 453 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SEALED JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM GOOGLE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
February 2, 2011 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2011 451 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SEALED STIPULATION (Cassady, Jason)
February 1, 2011 450 Featured Case ORDER granting 382 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of non-infringement; denying 398 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - concerning non-infringement filed by AOL Inc; denying 388 Sealed Patent Document - request regarding insufficient evidence to establish inequitable conduct and unclean hands; denying 387 Sealed Patent Document - request regarding insufficient evidence to establish lack of standing; denying 390 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - request concerning non-infringement filed by Google Inc.; denying 385 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request regarding patent-eligible subject matter; granting 386 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity of all asserted claims of the 120 patent; denying 389 Sealed Patent Document request regarding equitable estoppel; denying 383 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment on the issue of damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/11. cc:attys 2-02-11(mll, )
February 1, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Letter Brief Doc. 384: Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2011 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
January 31, 2011 449 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cheryl A Berry for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
January 28, 2011 448 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 28, 2011 447 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL-TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Cawley, Douglas)
January 28, 2011 446 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 28, 2011 445 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis)
January 28, 2011 444 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis)
January 28, 2011 443 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 28, 2011 442 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Bright, Christopher)
January 28, 2011 441 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Williams, E Danielle)
January 28, 2011 440 OBJECTION to 372 Report and Recommendations - Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendations of U.S. Magistrate Judge by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Williams, E Danielle)
January 28, 2011 439 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 28, 2011 438 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Morlock for Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (mll, )
January 28, 2011 437 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael)
January 28, 2011 436 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 28, 2011 435 Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 28, 2011 434 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 347 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Client representatives with the authority to agree/stipulate to any proposed agreements with regard to a trial plan should be present at the hearing so that any such stipulations or agreements may be binding and made on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/28/11. cc:attys 1-28-11(mll, )
January 27, 2011 433 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Hejny, Scott)
January 27, 2011 432 RESPONSE in Opposition re 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Aurentz, Phillip)
January 27, 2011 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
January 27, 2011 430 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Snider, Rosemary)
January 27, 2011 429 Featured Case ORDER denying 400 Sealed Motion to Strike, or Alternatively to Limit pltf's Patent Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, )
January 27, 2011 428 Featured Case ORDER granting 425 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, )
January 27, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties), 347 MOTION to Stay, 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox: ALSO be prepared to discuss your TRIAL PLAN: Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2011 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
January 26, 2011 427 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 426 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Corrected Declaration of C. Bright ISO Yahoo!'s Reply in Support of Its Emergency Motion to Strike(Bennett, Natalie)
January 26, 2011 426 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bright Decl ISO Reply, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Bennett, Natalie)
January 26, 2011 425 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopp. Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Reply in support of Emergency Motion to Strike by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Natalie)
January 26, 2011 424 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 263 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Bedrock shall produce the documents cited in this Order to all defts no later than 2-02-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, )
January 26, 2011 423 Featured Case ORDER granting 358 Sealed Patent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, )
January 25, 2011 422 Featured Case ORDER granting 405 Motion to Substitute Mediator. Hesha Abrams is SUBSTITUTED as Mediator for Judge Robert Faulkner. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, )
January 24, 2011 421 SEALED PATENT RESPONSIVE LETTER BRIEF by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., AOL Inc, Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc. to 387 Sealed Patent Document - LETTER BRIEF on Lack of Standing and Failure to Join Necessary Parties filed by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., AOL Inc, Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
January 24, 2011 420 REPLY to Response to Motion re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 24, 2011 419 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 24, 2011 418 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 417 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 416 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 415 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 414 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 413 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 412 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 411 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 410 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 409 .***AMENDED COMPLAINT against AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., CME Group Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., PayPal Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2011 (mjc, ).
January 24, 2011 409 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 410 .***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2011 (mjc, ).
January 24, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 407 Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT DOCKET EVENT.*** (mjc, )
January 24, 2011 408 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Greskowiak, Stacie)
January 24, 2011 407 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Greskowiak, Stacie) Modified on 1/24/2011 (mjc, ).
January 24, 2011 406 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 24, 2011 405 Agreed MOTION Substitute Mediator by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 21, 2011 404 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT. NO. 352) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mikhail Lotvin, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 19, 2011 403 Featured Case ORDER that pltf has to 5:00 p.m. 1-24-2011 to file its reply re 358 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-20-11(mll, )
January 19, 2011 Set Deadlines as to 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions. Response due by 1/24/2011; Replies due by 1/26/2011; Surreply due 1/28/2011. (mll, )
January 19, 2011 402 Featured Case ORDER granting 401 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. The Court orders pltf to respond to Yahoo's Emergency Motion to Strike 400 no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1-24-2011. A reply, if any, shall be submitted no later than 1-26-2011, and a surreply shall be filed no later than 1-28-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-20-11 (mll, )
January 18, 2011 401 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Yahoo!'s Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Emergency Motion to Strike by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
January 18, 2011 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chaikovsky Decl. ISO Emergency Motion to Strike, # 2 Affidavit James Decl. ISO Emergency Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B1, # 5 Exhibit B2, # 6 Exhibit B3, # 7 Exhibit B4, # 8 Exhibit B5, # 9 Exhibit B6, # 10 Exhibit B7, # 11 Exhibit B8, # 12 Exhibit C1, # 13 Exhibit C2, # 14 Exhibit C3, # 15 Exhibit D1, # 16 Exhibit D2, # 17 Exhibit D3, # 18 Exhibit D4, # 19 Exhibit D5, # 20 Exhibit D6, # 21 Supplement D7, # 22 Exhibit D8, # 23 Exhibit E, # 24 Exhibit F, # 25 Exhibit G, # 26 Exhibit H, # 27 Exhibit I, # 28 Exhibit J, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
January 18, 2011 398 Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AOL's Letter Brief Regarding Noninfringement)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 17, 2011 397 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of AOL Inc (Dacus, Deron)
January 17, 2011 396 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of MySpace Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
January 14, 2011 399 Featured Case HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 01/14/11. cc:attys 1-18-11(mll, )
January 13, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 391 , Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 392 .*** (mjc, )
January 13, 2011 395 NOTICE of Disclosure by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Curry, John)
January 13, 2011 394 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Fourth Amended Disclosures (Bright, Christopher)
January 13, 2011 393 NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Karasik, Louis)
January 13, 2011 392 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. [CORRECTED] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
January 12, 2011 391 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 392 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mll, ).
January 12, 2011 390 Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael)
January 12, 2011 389 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 12, 2011 388 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 12, 2011 387 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 12, 2011 386 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 12, 2011 385 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 12, 2011 384 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis)
January 12, 2011 383 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis)
January 12, 2011 382 Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
January 12, 2011 381 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 384 .***Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc. (Karasik, Louis) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mjc, ).
January 12, 2011 380 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 383 .***Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc. (Karasik, Louis) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mjc, ).
January 12, 2011 379 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE by AOL Inc re 378 Sealed Patent Document Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/14/2011 (mjc, ).
January 12, 2011 378 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AOL's Opening Letter Brief for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5, 893,120)(Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/14/2011 (mjc, ).
January 11, 2011 Deadlines reset per 375 Order: Expert Discovery due by 2/11/2011. Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2011; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 2-01-2011. Identify trial witnesses by 2/10/2011; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 2-21-2011. Jury instructions due by 2/28/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2011. (mll, )
January 11, 2011 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Stern, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 11, 2011 376 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 358 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 11, 2011 375 Featured Case ORDER granting 366 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/11/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, )
January 11, 2011 374 Featured Case ORDER granting 365 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/11/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, )
January 11, 2011 373 Featured Case ORDER granting 363 Motion for Leave to Depose Alexey Kuznetsov. Parties may depose Alexey Kuznetsov after the 1-10-2011 deadline for the completion of fact discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/11/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, )
January 11, 2011 372 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/11/11. cc:attys 1-11-11(mll, )
January 11, 2011 371 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL Inc Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Whitehurst, Alan)
January 11, 2011 370 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC Supplemental Initial Disclosures [2nd for Google and 3rd for Match] (Jones, Michael)
January 11, 2011 368 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cannon Low on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Low, John)
January 10, 2011 369 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11(mll, )
January 10, 2011 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 10, 2011 366 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 10, 2011 365 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Re Certain Deadlines by Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
January 10, 2011 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 10, 2011 363 Joint MOTION for Leave to Depose Alexey Kuznetsov by Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 7, 2011 362 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy Lynn Greskowiak on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Greskowiak, Stacy)
January 6, 2011 360 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Abbott Hargrave on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Hargrave, Ryan)
January 5, 2011 359 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE TO ITS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 5, 2011 358 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 4, 2011 357 Featured Case ORDER that the Court upholds the privilege claimed with regard to entry 56 and the documents previously designated as "Disclosed to third party (USPTO)." Bedrock has sufficiently explained the invocation of privilege and as such these documents should not be produced. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-04-11(mll, )
January 3, 2011 356 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. BEDROCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT. 352) (Cawley, Douglas)
January 3, 2011 355 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 348 Sealed Patent Motion for Protective Order. GRANTED to the extent that Helen Nemes' deposition is unnecessary. Documents regarding the valuation of US Patent No 5,893,120 shall be produced to defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/03/11. cc:attys 1-03-11 (mll, )
December 30, 2010 354 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 30, 2010 353 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Cawley, Douglas)
December 27, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Response due by 5:00 p.m. 12/30/2010; Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
December 27, 2010 351 Featured Case ORDER granting 349 Sealed Patent Motion for Expedited Response. Defendants shall respond no later than 5:00 p.m. on 12-30-2010 to plaintiff's 348 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. A telephonic hearing will be held on 1-03-2011 at 1:30 p.m. The telephonic hearing originally scheduled for 12-29-2010 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/27/10. cc:attys 12-27-10 (mll, )
December 23, 2010 350 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Gorham, Andrew)
December 22, 2010 349 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE TO ITS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [DKT # 348] by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
December 22, 2010 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
December 21, 2010 347 MOTION to Stay by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
December 21, 2010 346 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Notice of Service of Defendants' Joint Amended Invalidity Contentions (Williams, E Danielle)
December 9, 2010 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip M Aurentz on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Aurentz, Phillip)
December 9, 2010 343 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Hejny on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Hejny, Scott)
December 2, 2010 342 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Andrews, John)
December 2, 2010 341 Featured Case ORDER granting 340 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/02/10. cc:attys 12-02-10 (mll, )
December 1, 2010 340 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
November 23, 2010 339 Featured Case ORDER that prior to filing any summary judgment motion, parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; prior to filing any motions to strike or Daubert Motions, the parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; each side is limited to 10 disputed motions in limine; each side is limited to designating 250 exhibits for trial absent a showing of good cause; each side is limited to designating no more than 10 hours of deposition testimony for use at trial absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-23-10(mll, )
November 23, 2010 338 NOTICE of Disclosure by Match.Com LLC regarding 2nd Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
November 23, 2010 337 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Keith James on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (James, Bryan)
November 18, 2010 335 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Notice of Service of Defendants' Supplemental Joint Invalidity Contentions (Williams, E Danielle)
November 16, 2010 336 Sealed minutes on Sealed Motion to Compels, documents #217 and #263. (mjm, )
November 16, 2010 334 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Ann Bennett on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Bennett, Natalie)
November 15, 2010 333 Featured Case ORDER granting 328 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/12/10. cc;attys 11-15-10 (mll, )
November 15, 2010 332 Featured Case ORDER granting 331 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file objections and/or a motion to reconsider is extended to 12-03-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-15-10 (mll, )
November 12, 2010 331 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to and/or a Motion to Reconsider concerning the Court's Provisional Claim Construction Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 10, 2010 330 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 10, 2010 329 Featured Case ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $2,583.75 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2010 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $5,167.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/10/10. cc:attys 11-10-10(mll, )
November 10, 2010 328 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement Invalidity Contentions) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
November 4, 2010 327 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Notice of Yahoo!'s Amended Rule 26 Disclosures (Bright, Christopher)
October 29, 2010 326 Featured Case ORDER setting forth provisional claim constructions for disputed claim terms in US Patent No 5,893,120. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/29/10. cc:attys 10-29-10(mll, )
October 25, 2010 325 Featured Case ORDER denying 219 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/10. cc:attys 10-26-10 (mll, )
October 25, 2010 324 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC regarding First Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2010 323 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING COURT'S ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS (Cawley, Douglas)
October 21, 2010 322 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding Court's Order to Meet and Confer Regarding Claim Constructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summary of Disputed Terms)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
October 18, 2010 321 Featured Case ORDER to pay technical advisor Richard Egan $13,297.16 for services rendered by 11/1/2010, with Plaintiffs to pay one half, $6,648.58, and Defendants, collectively, to pay one half, $6,648.58. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/10. (mjc, )
October 18, 2010 320 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 185 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts Regarding Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/2010. (gsg)
October 15, 2010 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log, 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1: Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2010 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
October 12, 2010 319 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 210 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting 246 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting 259 Motion to Compel; granting 270 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 271 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Bedrock shall supplement its infringement contentions by 10-14-10. Bedrock is granted leave to pursue further discovery to complete its supplementary infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, )
October 7, 2010 318 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 10/7/2010, Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2010 re 259 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response To Their Sixth Interrogatories filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Match.Com LLC, 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian.) (mjm, )
October 6, 2010 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fay E Morisseau on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Morisseau, Fay)
October 5, 2010 316 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 5, 2010 315 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel M Capoccia on behalf of MySpace Inc. (Capoccia, Rachel)
October 4, 2010 314 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 304 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, 308 Order (Briggs, Todd)
October 4, 2010 313 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
October 4, 2010 312 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 304 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, 308 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cassady, Jason)
October 1, 2010 311 REPLY to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Antonio Sistos, # 2 Exhibit A)(Sistos, Antonio)
October 1, 2010 310 Featured Case ORDER granting 307 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness; Replies due by 10/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10 (mll, )
October 1, 2010 309 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Williams, E Danielle)
September 30, 2010 308 Featured Case ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/30/10. cc:attys 9-30-10(mll, )
September 30, 2010 307 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 29, 2010 306 Featured Case ORDER setting Claim Construction Hearing for 10/7/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/29/10. cc:attys 9-30-10(mll, )
September 28, 2010 305 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/10. cc:attys 9-29-10(mll, )
September 27, 2010 304 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 Motion to Compel; granting 288 Motion to Set a Case Management Conference. Pltf shall amend its PICs to provide as specific information as possible regarding where each element of each asserted claim is found within defts' products. The Court will hear all pending motions cited in footnote three of this Order at the 10-07-2010 Markman Hearing. The Court orders lead trial and local counsel to meet and confer as to each of these pending motions. The parties will notify the Court of the results of their meet and confer by 10-04-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/10. cc:attys 9-28-10 (mll, )
September 27, 2010 303 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Henry Lien for Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
September 27, 2010 302 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE filed by MySpace Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 27, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion 271 submitted by MySpace Inc. Deficiency: No Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by Next business day (kls, )
September 24, 2010 301 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC NOTICE OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME REQUESTED FOR THE MARKMAN HEARING (Briggs, Todd)
September 24, 2010 300 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 24, 2010 299 RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
September 24, 2010 298 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - DEFICIENT FOR NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE*** SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE filed by MySpace Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kls, ).
September 24, 2010 297 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME REQUESTED FOR THE MARKMAN HEARING (Cassady, Jason)
September 24, 2010 296 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY filed by AOL Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 22, 2010 295 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log filed by AOL Inc, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 21, 2010 294 Featured Case ORDER granting 292 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log; Responses due by 9/22/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10 (mll, )
September 20, 2010 293 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. of Compliance re: Technology Tutorial (Heartfield, J)
September 20, 2010 292 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log by AOL Inc, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 17, 2010 291 REPLY to Response to Motion re 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 17, 2010 290 REPLY to Response to Motion re 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 15, 2010 289 Featured Case ORDER granting 287 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log; Replies due by 9/20/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/10. cc:attys 9-15-10 (mll, )
September 14, 2010 288 Opposed MOTION TO SET A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 13, 2010 287 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log by AOL Inc, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 13, 2010 286 Featured Case ORDER granting 282 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for pltf to file its proof in accordance with the Discovery Order is extended to 9-16-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/10. cc:attys 9-13-10 (mll, )
September 10, 2010 285 Corrected Exhibit 2 to Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 10, 2010 284 Response to CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5-1, # 7 Exhibit 5-2, # 8 Exhibit 5-3, # 9 Exhibit 5-4, # 10 Exhibit 5-5, # 11 Exhibit 5-6, # 12 Exhibit 6)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 10, 2010 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Antonio Sistos ISO Defendants' MSJ of Indefiniteness, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
September 9, 2010 282 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 7, 2010 281 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE filed by MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Response, # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
September 7, 2010 280 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY filed by MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Response, # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
September 7, 2010 279 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY filed by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Response, # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
September 3, 2010 278 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response To Their Sixth Interrogatories filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 3, 2010 277 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
September 1, 2010 276 Featured Case ORDER granting 274 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/01/10. cc:attys 9-02-10 (mll, )
August 27, 2010 275 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 9 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 27, 2010 274 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
August 23, 2010 273 REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response To Their Sixth Interrogatories filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A.7)(Briggs, Todd)
August 23, 2010 272 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A.7)(Briggs, Todd)
August 19, 2010 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 19, 2010 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 19, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 268, Motion to Compel from AOL and MYSPACE a Complete Response AND Motion to Compel Productions of Documents from MYSPACE. MOTIONS SHOULD BE FILED SEPARATELY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
August 18, 2010 269 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Cassady, Jason)
August 18, 2010 268 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR AS TWO MOTIONS-PLEADINGS SHOULD BE FILED SEPARATELY*** SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM AOL AND MYSPACE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FOURTH INTERROGATORY AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM MYSPACE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Text of Proposed Order, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 8/19/2010 (kls, ).
August 18, 2010 267 Featured Case ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log; Responses due by 9/3/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/10. cc:attys 8-18-10(mll, )
August 17, 2010 266 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 12, 2010 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re 259 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response To Their Sixth Interrogatories filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
August 12, 2010 264 REPLY to Response to Motion re 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
August 9, 2010 263 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Non-Privileged Testimony and Documents from Mikhail Lotvin and Bedrock and Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Bedrock's Privilege Log by AOL Inc, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Todd Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 5, 2010 262 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher D Bright on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Bright, Christopher)
August 3, 2010 261 Featured Case ORDER appointing Richard Egan as the Court's Technical Advisor, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/10. cc:attys 8-04-10(mll, )
August 3, 2010 260 Featured Case ORDER granting 255 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, and extending time for tutorials to 9-20-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/10. cc:attys 8-03-10 (mll, )
August 2, 2010 259 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response To Their Sixth Interrogatories by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Ex. A, # 3 Exhibit A.1, # 4 Exhibit A.2, # 5 Exhibit A.3, # 6 Exhibit A.4, # 7 Exhibit A.5, # 8 Exhibit A.6)(Briggs, Todd)
August 2, 2010 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Ex. A, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A.1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. A.2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. A.3, # 6 Exhibit Ex. A.4, # 7 Exhibit Ex. A.5, # 8 Exhibit Ex. A.6)(Briggs, Todd)
August 2, 2010 257 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV)(Briggs, Todd)
August 2, 2010 256 Featured Case ORDER granting 209 Motion to Clarify the Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/10. cc:attys 8-02-10 (mll, )
August 2, 2010 255 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.)
July 30, 2010 254 Featured Case ORDER granting 253 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for parties to propose Technical Advisors is extended to 8-02-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/30/10. cc:attys 7-30-10 (mll, )
July 29, 2010 253 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 27, 2010 252 Featured Case ORDER regarding Claim Construction Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/27/10. cc:attys 7-27-10(mll, )
July 26, 2010 251 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Briggs, Todd)
July 20, 2010 250 Featured Case ORDER granting 248 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is extended to 7-26-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/20/10. cc:attys 7-20-10 (mll, )
July 19, 2010 249 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 219 MOTION to Intervene filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
July 16, 2010 248 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
July 15, 2010 247 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 15, 2010 246 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S FIFTH INTERROGATORY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 9, 2010 245 REPLY to Response to Motion re 219 MOTION to Intervene (Red Hat, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Intervene) filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle)
July 6, 2010 244 Featured Case ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Bedrock's Response re 219 Red Hat's MOTION to Intervene. Replies due by 7/9/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/6/2010.(kls, )
July 2, 2010 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 239 Response in Opposition to Motion by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
June 29, 2010 242 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 222 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. DENIED as to the Softlayer Defendants. GRANTED as to the Red Hat Defendants. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, )
June 28, 2010 241 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 209 MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Briggs, Todd)
June 28, 2010 240 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 210 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S THIRD INTERROGATORY AND PRODUCTION OF GOOGLE'S SOURCE CODE filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Michael)
June 25, 2010 239 RESPONSE in Opposition re 219 MOTION to Intervene filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 22, 2010 238 Featured Case ORDER granting 235 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. The mediation deadline is extended to 8-17-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/10. cc:attys 6-22-10 (mll, )
June 22, 2010 237 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO P.R. 4-2 (Cassady, Jason)
June 21, 2010 236 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Heartfield, J)
June 21, 2010 235 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Mediation Deadline by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
June 18, 2010 234 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A.1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 18, 2010 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re 209 MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 18, 2010 232 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 210 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S THIRD INTERROGATORY AND PRODUCTION OF GOOGLE'S SOURCE CODE filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 18, 2010 231 Featured Case ORDER granting 230 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/18/10. (mjc, )
June 17, 2010 230 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order - regarding exchange of Privilege Logs by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
June 15, 2010 229 NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Orders (Heartfield, J)
June 11, 2010 228 RESPONSE to Motion re 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Orders filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 10, 2010 227 Featured Case ORDER granting 226 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 219 MOTION to Intervene; Responses due by 6/25/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/10/10. cc:attys 6-10-10 (mll, )
June 9, 2010 226 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 219 MOTION to Intervene by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 7, 2010 225 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Amended))(Jones, Michael)
June 7, 2010 224 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 210 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S THIRD INTERROGATORY AND PRODUCTION OF GOOGLE'S SOURCE CODE filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 7, 2010 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re 209 MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 7, 2010 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Orders by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
June 4, 2010 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cassady, Jason)
June 1, 2010 220 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Red Hat, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
June 1, 2010 219 MOTION to Intervene by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
May 28, 2010 218 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 25, 2010 217 SEALED MOTION to Compel Bedrock to Remove the Confidentiality Designation of Bedrocks Second Supplemental Response to Match.coms Interrogatory No. 1 by Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Evette D. Pennypacker, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Pennypacker, Evette)
May 24, 2010 216 ANSWER to 197 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
May 24, 2010 215 ANSWER to 196 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
May 24, 2010 214 ANSWER to 199 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
May 24, 2010 213 ANSWER to 200 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
May 24, 2010 212 ANSWER to 194 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
May 21, 2010 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 204 Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. The mediation deadline for pltf and defts Softlayer Technologies and Amazon.com is extended to 5-19-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/10. cc:attys 5-21-10 (mll, )
May 20, 2010 210 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM GOOGLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO BEDROCK'S THIRD INTERROGATORY AND PRODUCTION OF GOOGLE'S SOURCE CODE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit A.11, # 13 Exhibit A.12, # 14 Exhibit A.13, # 15 Exhibit A.14, # 16 Exhibit A.15, # 17 Exhibit B, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 20, 2010 209 MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Protective Order by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF JONATHAN R. YIM, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 20, 2010 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alton Absher, III on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Absher, Alton)
May 19, 2010 207 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-1 (Baxter, Samuel)
May 19, 2010 206 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. - Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 on behalf of Softlayer, Amazon, Google, Yahoo!, Myspace, Match.com and AOL (Williams, E Danielle)
May 12, 2010 205 Featured Case ORDER granting 203 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for mediation is extended to 6-18-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/12/10. cc:attys 5-12-10(mll, )
May 11, 2010 204 Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
May 11, 2010 203 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducca, Marissa)
May 6, 2010 202 Featured Case ORDER granting 201 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft PayPal Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10 (mll, )
May 5, 2010 201 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 30, 2010 200 Google Inc.s ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc..(Briggs, Todd)
April 30, 2010 199 Match.com, LLC's ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.Com LLC.(Briggs, Todd)
April 30, 2010 198 Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint - Answer to Bedrock's Second Amended Complaint 191 by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
April 30, 2010 197 Yahoo!'s ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 30, 2010 196 MySpace Inc.'s ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by MySpace Inc..(Whitehurst, Alan)
April 30, 2010 195 Paypal's ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by PayPal Inc..(Whitehurst, Alan)
April 30, 2010 194 AOL's ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by AOL Inc.(Whitehurst, Alan)
April 30, 2010 193 Amazon.com's ANSWER to 191 Amended Complaint,, (Second Amended) by Amazon.com Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
April 28, 2010 192 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Google Inc., Match.Com LLC (Clutter, Patrick)
April 13, 2010 191 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., PayPal Inc., Yahoo! Inc., filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2010: # 11 Searchable Exhibit A) (mjc, ).
March 29, 2010 189 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss; granting 113 Motion to Dismiss. Pltf is granted leave to amend its complaint within the next 15 days to comply with Rule 8. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/29/10. cc:attys 3-29-10(mll, )
March 23, 2010 188 REPLY to Response to Motion re 185 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts regarding 133 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with PR 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts regarding 133 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with PR 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Michael)
March 19, 2010 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re 185 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts regarding 133 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with PR 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts regarding 133 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with PR 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 4, 2010 186 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions [Notice of Supplemental Facts] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Jones, Michael)
March 4, 2010 185 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts regarding 133 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with PR 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 4, 2010 184 Featured Case ORDER granting 183 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kamran Jivani terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/10. cc:attys 3-04-10 (mll, )
March 3, 2010 183 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kamran Jivani by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
February 23, 2010 182 Featured Case ORDER granting 181 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Christopher Nelson and Matthew D Orwig terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/10. cc:attys 2-23-10 (mll, )
February 22, 2010 181 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Nelson, Mark)
February 16, 2010 180 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell A Korn for Softlayer Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc.. (mll, )
February 16, 2010 179 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Softlayer Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc.. (mll, )
February 16, 2010 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Alemanni, John)
February 9, 2010 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
February 9, 2010 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Heartfield, J)
February 4, 2010 175 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Cawley, Douglas)
February 3, 2010 Deadlines set per 174 Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2010; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 8-05-2010. Discovery due by 1/10/2011. Expert Witness List due by 12/1/2010; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 12-13-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 1/24/2011; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 2-04-2011. Jury instructions due by 1/28/2011. Mediation Completion due by 5/11/2010. Robert Faulkner is appointed Mediator in this case. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2011; Response to Dispositive Motions due 2-28-2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/28/2011. Motions in limine due 3-14-2011; Responses to Motions in limine due 3-17-2011. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 10/7/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial is five days. (mll, )
February 3, 2010 174 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/10. cc:attys 2-03-10(mll, )
February 3, 2010 173 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/10. cc:attys 2-03-10(mll, )
February 2, 2010 172 Featured Case ORDER granting 171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marissa Rachel Ducca; Louis A Karasik; Michael J Newton; Alan Lee Whitehurst; Jason Woodard Cook and Thomas W Davison terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/2/10. (mjc, )
February 1, 2010 171 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
February 1, 2010 170 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/10. cc:attys 2-01-10(mll, )
January 29, 2010 169 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control, Discovery, and Protective Orders by AOL Inc, CME Group Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Ex B - Discovery Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Ex C - Agreed Protective Order)(Gardner, Allen)
January 29, 2010 168 Featured Case ORDER granting 167 Motion to Dismiss. All claims for relief asserted between Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC and CME Groups Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/10. cc:attys 1-29-10 (mll, )
January 28, 2010 167 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by CME Group Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 26, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Robert W Faulkner added as Mediator per 166 Order. (mll, )
January 26, 2010 166 Featured Case ORDER re 106 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order,, filed by Match.com, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, PayPal Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CME Group Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc, CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, and 165 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (With Two Remaining Disputes Noted) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, PayPal Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CME Group Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc, CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC. Former Judge Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this case. Parties shall refile their Joint Motion for Entry of Docket and Discovery Orders and Joint Motion for Protective Order in accordance with the rulings made in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/10. cc:attys 1-26-10(mll, )
January 22, 2010 165 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (With Two Remaining Disputes Noted) by AOL Inc, CME Group Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (With Two Remaining Disputes Noted))(Gardner, Allen)
January 22, 2010 164 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time, and extending the deadline for defts' to serve their invalidity contentions to 1-08-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/10. cc:attys 1-22-10 (mll, )
January 21, 2010 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 161 Motion to Seal and for Leave to file Surreply in Opposition to defts' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/10. cc:attys 1-22-10 (mll, )
January 19, 2010 162 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Johathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 19, 2010 161 Unopposed MOTION to Seal SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH PATENT RULE 3-1 AND TO EXTEND THE TIME TO SERVE INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS UNDER SEAL by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 15, 2010 The Docket Sheet is modified to show that "AOL LLC" is changed to "AOL Inc" (per 160 Order). (mll, )
January 15, 2010 160 Featured Case ORDER granting 158 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Sheet. The docket sheet and case caption for this case shall be modified to reflect that "AOL LLC" is now "AOL Inc". Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/15/10. cc:attys 1-15-10 (mll, )
January 14, 2010 159 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC (Whitehurst, Alan)
January 14, 2010 158 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct The Docket Sheet by AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 13, 2010 157 Featured Case ORDER granting 155 Motion to Continue. The deadline for parties to comply with Patent Rule 4-1 is 5-18-2010, with the understanding that if the Court enters a Docket Control Order before that time, the Docket Control Order will control the deadline for PR 4-1. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/10. cc:attys 1-13-10(mll, )
January 12, 2010 156 NOTICE of Change of Address by Claude M Stern (Stern, Claude)
January 12, 2010 155 Joint MOTION to Continue Date for P.R. 4-1 Disclosures by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 154, Joint Motion to Continue. Attorney to Refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
January 11, 2010 154 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** Joint MOTION to Continue Date for P.R. 4-1 Disclosures by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, PayPal Inc., Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., Match.Com LLC, CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/12/2010 (kls, ).
January 11, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 147 , Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS OVER PAGE LIMITS. REPLACED BY 152 .*** (mjc, )
January 11, 2010 153 NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Storm, Paul)
January 11, 2010 152 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 147 .*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions CORRECTED REPLY filed by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/11/2010 (mjc, ).
January 8, 2010 151 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Chaikovsky, Yar)
January 8, 2010 150 NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., Match.Com LLC GOOGLE INC. AND MATCH.COM, LLC'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULES 3-3 AND 3-4 (Briggs, Todd)
January 8, 2010 149 NOTICE by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. of Compliance with PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Whitehurst, Alan)
January 8, 2010 148 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Stein, David)
January 8, 2010 147 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 152 .*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/11/2010 (mjc, ).
January 8, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 146 , Motion to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION.*** (mjc, )
January 7, 2010 146 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Compel Reply Motion In Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and To Extend The Time To Serve Invalidity Contentions by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 1/8/2010 (mjc, ).
January 7, 2010 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 7, 2010 144 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Gardner on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (Gardner, Steven)
January 6, 2010 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
January 6, 2010 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Gardner on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Gardner, John)
December 30, 2009 141 Featured Case ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defts to file their Reply in Support of defts' Motion to Compel pltf to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions is 1-07-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/09. cc:attys 12-30-09(mll, )
December 30, 2009 140 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Association of Counsel (Chaikovsky, Yar)
December 30, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 139 Association of Counsel submitted by Yahoo! Inc. Document does not contain a certificate of service. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
December 29, 2009 139 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Association Of Counsel (Chaikovsky, Yar) Modified on 12/30/2009 (mjc, ).
December 29, 2009 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
December 29, 2009 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
December 23, 2009 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas)
December 22, 2009 135 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Comply re P.R. 3-3 by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Anthony)
December 15, 2009 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Yim, Jonathan)
December 9, 2009 133 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and to Extend the Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
December 9, 2009 132 Featured Case ORDER granting 131 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael Jones is allowed to withdraw as atty for deft MySpace Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/09. cc:attys 12-09-09 (mll, )
December 7, 2009 131 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm by MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 4, 2009 130 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/04/09. cc:attys 12-04-09(mll, )
December 3, 2009 129 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 2, 2009 128 ANSWER to 109 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
December 2, 2009 127 ANSWER to 110 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
December 2, 2009 126 ANSWER to 111 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
December 2, 2009 125 ANSWER to 112 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas)
December 2, 2009 124 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas)
December 1, 2009 123 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Chaikovsky, Yar)
December 1, 2009 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas W Davison on behalf of AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Davison, Thomas)
December 1, 2009 121 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Alan Lee Whitehurst on behalf of AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
November 30, 2009 120 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., PayPal Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
November 30, 2009 119 NOTICE of Disclosure by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
November 30, 2009 118 NOTICE of Disclosure by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
November 30, 2009 117 NOTICE of Disclosure by Match.Com LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sistos, Antonio)
November 30, 2009 116 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sistos, Antonio)
November 20, 2009 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re 113 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 18, 2009 114 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC personally served on 11/13/2009 by Process Server Kent Broelle, answer due 12/3/2009. (ehs, )
November 17, 2009 113 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 16, 2009 112 Defendant Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Storm, Paul)
November 13, 2009 111 ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by PayPal Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 13, 2009 110 ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.Com LLC.(Jones, Michael)
November 13, 2009 109 ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 13, 2009 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., PayPal Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
November 12, 2009 107 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
November 5, 2009 106 Submission of Parties' Proposed Docket Control Orders and Discovery Orders by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc., Match.com, Inc. Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control and Discovery Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed DCO, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed DCO, # 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Order, # 4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Proposed Discovery Order)(Bunt, Robert)
November 3, 2009 105 Featured Case ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 11-05-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/09. cc:attys 11-03-09 (mll, )
November 2, 2009 104 Featured Case ORDER granting 101 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pltf is granted leave to amend its Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09(mll, )
November 2, 2009 103 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
October 30, 2009 102 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Match.Com LLC, AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc., filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 30, 2009 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 16, 2009 100 ANSWER to 85 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
October 16, 2009 99 ANSWER to 86 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
October 16, 2009 98 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 16, 2009 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for the parties to file proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to November 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/2009. (gsg)
October 14, 2009 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
October 13, 2009 95 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Baxter, Samuel)
October 7, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 10-19-2009. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 10-19-2009 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 10-09-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/09. cc:attys 10-08-09(mll, )
October 6, 2009 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kamran Jivani on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (Jivani, Kamran)
October 5, 2009 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 10/5/2009.(refer to document #93) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) Modified on 10/13/2009 (mjm, ).
October 5, 2009 93 Minute Entry -- 10.5.09 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 10/5/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
October 5, 2009 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Whitehurst, Alan)
October 5, 2009 90 AMENDED ANSWER to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
October 5, 2009 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Cook, Jason)
October 1, 2009 88 ANSWER to 63 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
September 29, 2009 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacey Garrett White on behalf of MySpace Inc. (White, Stacey)
September 28, 2009 86 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 28, 2009 85 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.com, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 24, 2009 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 21, 2009 83 Featured Case ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/21/09. (mjc, )
September 17, 2009 82 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, Inc. by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Storm, Paul) Modified on 9/17/2009 to reflect the counterclaim is against Bedrock (mjc, ).
September 17, 2009 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storm, Paul)
September 16, 2009 80 Featured Case ORDER granting 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/09. cc:attys 9-16-09 (mll, )
September 15, 2009 79 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
September 14, 2009 78 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference set for 10/5/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/14/09. cc:attys 9-14-09(mll, )
September 11, 2009 77 NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO THE COURT THAT THE CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Baxter, Samuel)
September 9, 2009 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 9, 2009 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CME Group Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 9, 2009 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 9, 2009 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 9, 2009 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
September 9, 2009 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2009: # 4 Corrected Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 9, 2009 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
September 9, 2009 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActiveCorp for Match.com, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2009 68 Match.com, LLC's [incorrectly named Match.com, Inc.] ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.com, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2009 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2009 66 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2009 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Scott Pershern on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Pershern, Steven)
September 9, 2009 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PayPal Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ebay Inc. for PayPal Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2009 63 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by PayPal Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 4, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for Yahoo to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is September 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/4/2009. (gsg)
September 3, 2009 61 ANSWER to 47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
September 3, 2009 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Yahoo Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 3, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 59, Fourth Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT NEEDS TO BE REFILED AS A MOTION.*** (mjc, )
September 2, 2009 59 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Chaikovsky, Yar) Modified on 9/3/2009 (mjc, ).
August 24, 2009 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft PayPal Inc has through 9-09-2009 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/09. cc:attys 8-24-09 (mll, )
August 21, 2009 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 19, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 54 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 9/8/2009. 18 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 18, 2009 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL LLC, MySpace Inc, Amazon.com Inc, and CME Group Inc shall have through and including 9-09-09 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/09. cc:attys 8-19-09 (mll, )
August 17, 2009 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
August 14, 2009 54 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Lee, John)
August 12, 2009 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Evette D Pennypacker for Google Inc. and Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
August 12, 2009 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd M Briggs for Google Inc. and Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
August 12, 2009 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Claude M Stern for Google Inc. and Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
August 12, 2009 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for Google Inc. and Match.com, Inc.. (mll, )
August 12, 2009 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Louis A Karasik for AOL LLC, MySpace Inc. and Amazon.com Inc.. (mll, )
August 12, 2009 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Orwig on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Orwig, Matthew)
August 11, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 43 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 8/22/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 11, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 40 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MySpace Inc. to 8/24/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 11, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 39 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL LLC to 8/24/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 11, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 38 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Inc. to 8/24/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 10, 2009 47 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Storm, Paul)
August 10, 2009 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Google Inc and Match.com Inc have until and through 9-09-09 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09(mll, )
August 7, 2009 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Nelson on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Nelson, Mark)
August 7, 2009 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 6, 2009 43 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Lee, John)
August 6, 2009 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Alexander Lee on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Lee, John)
August 6, 2009 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 5, 2009 40 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MySpace Inc..( Whitehurst, Alan)
August 5, 2009 39 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AOL LLC.( Whitehurst, Alan)
August 5, 2009 38 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com Inc..( Whitehurst, Alan)
August 5, 2009 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Lee Whitehurst on behalf of AOL LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
August 5, 2009 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marissa Rachel Ducca on behalf of AOL LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Ducca, Marissa)
August 5, 2009 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of AOL LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc. (Newton, Michael)
August 4, 2009 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft PayPal Inc has until and through 8-24-09 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/09. cc:attys 8-04-09 (mll, )
August 3, 2009 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by PayPal Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 23, 2009 32 Return of Service Executed as to MySpace Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 23, 2009 31 Return of Service Executed as to AOL LLC on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 21, 2009 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. CME Group Inc. served on 6/24/2009 by process server on CT Corporation, answer due 7/14/2009. (ehs, )
July 17, 2009 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for deft CME Groups Inc to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 8-15-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/17/09. cc:attys 7-17-09 (mll, )
July 15, 2009 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CME GROUP INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 10, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 27 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Inc. to 8/10/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 10, 2009 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 9, 2009 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Curry, John)
July 9, 2009 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Stevenson, Theodore)
July 2, 2009 24 Return of Service Executed as to Google Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 23 Return of Service Executed as to PayPal Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 22 Return of Service Executed as to Amazon.com Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service; answer due: 7/9/2009. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 21 Return of Service Executed as to CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC on 6/22/2009, by personal service; answer due: 7/13/2009. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 20 Return of Service Executed as to Softlayer Technologies, Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 19 Return of Service Executed as to Yahoo! Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 18 Return of Service Executed as to Match.com, Inc. on 6/19/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 17 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Softlayer Technologies, Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 14 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 13 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL LLC to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 1, 2009 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Softlayer Technologies, Inc..( Miller, Anthony)
July 1, 2009 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony P Miller on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Miller, Anthony)
July 1, 2009 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul V Storm on behalf of Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
July 1, 2009 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Jones, Michael)
July 1, 2009 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AOL LLC.( Whitehurst, Alan)
June 30, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PayPal Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 30, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MySpace Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 30, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com, Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 30, 2009 12 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2009 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PayPal Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 26, 2009 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MySpace Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 26, 2009 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Match.com, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 25, 2009 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Google Inc. (Jones, Michael)
June 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, )
June 22, 2009 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 22, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/22/2009. (kls, )
June 18, 2009 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc., Match.com, Inc., and emailed to pltf's atty for service. (mll, )
June 17, 2009 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
June 17, 2009 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Parker, Robert)
June 16, 2009 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
June 16, 2009 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 16, 2009 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AOL LLC, CME Group Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., PayPal Inc., Match.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002036921.), filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC v. Softlayer Technologies, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softlayer Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CME Group Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]